EP1705665 - Conduction control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states Hitachi Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wunderlich, Jörg 27 Bailey Mews Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB5 8DR / GB | 02 /
Ito, Kenchi 3 Rayleigh Close Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB2 2AZ / GB | [2006/39] | Representative(s) | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP 406 Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0WW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | ||
Former [2006/39] | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06110454.3 | 27.02.2006 | [2006/39] | Priority number, date | EP20050102430 | 24.03.2005 Original published format: EP 05102430 | EP20050102529 | 30.03.2005 Original published format: EP 05102529 | GB20050014371 | 14.07.2005 Original published format: GB 0514371 | [2006/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1705665 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1705665 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/16 | [2006/39] | CPC: |
G11C11/16 (EP,US);
A47J47/20 (KR);
G11C11/161 (EP,US);
G11C11/1659 (EP,US);
G11C11/1693 (EP,US);
H01F10/3254 (EP);
H01F41/307 (EP);
H10B61/00 (EP,US);
H10N50/01 (EP,US);
H10N50/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/22] |
Former [2006/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Leitungssteuerungsanordnung | [2006/39] | English: | Conduction control device | [2006/39] | French: | dispositif du contrôle de la conduction | [2006/39] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 14.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.03.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.07.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.05.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5936402 (SCHEP CORNELIS M [NL], et al) [A] 1-32 * column 7, line 27 - line 47; figure 7 *; | [A] - RÜSTER C ET AL, "Very large magnetoresistance in lateral ferromagnetic (Ga,Mn)As wires with nanoconstrictions", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, NEW YORK,NY, US, (20031121), vol. 91, no. 21, ISSN 0031-9007, pages 216602 - 1, XP002337561 [A] 1-32 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevLett.91.216602 | [A] - LEPADATU ET AL, "Direct Observation of Domain Wall Scattering in Patterned Ni80Fe20 and Ni Nanowires by Current-Voltage Measurements", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, NEW YORK,NY, US, (20040326), vol. 92, no. 12, ISSN 0031-9007, pages 127201 - 1, XP002365712 [A] 1-32 * figures 1,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevLett.92.127201 | [PA] - GIDDINGS ET AL, "Large Tunneling Anisotropic Magnetoresistance in (Ga,Mn)As Nanoconstrictions", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, NEW YORK,NY, US, (20050401), ISSN 0031-9007, pages 127202 - 1, XP002365713 [PA] 1-32 * figure 1 * |