EP1701161 - Fire detector having an optical sensor and a gas sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/37] | Gas sensor | ||
[2011/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schumann, Bernd / Hegelstrasse 34 71277, Rutesheim / DE | [2011/40] |
Former [2006/37] | 01 /
Schumann, Bernd Hegelstrasse 34 71277, Rutesheim / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/40] | Application number, filing date | 06110733.0 | 06.03.2006 | [2006/37] | Priority number, date | DE20051010454 | 08.03.2005 Original published format: DE102005010454 | [2006/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1701161 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1701161 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | [2007/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1701161 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/414, G01N21/53 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
G01N21/3151 (EP,US);
G01N21/47 (EP,US);
G01N33/0032 (EP,US);
G01N15/075 (EP,US);
G01N2201/0627 (EP,US);
G01N27/4141 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/37] | G01N33/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2008/01] |
Former [2006/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Brandmelder mit Streustrahlungssensor und Gassensor | [2011/28] | English: | Fire detector having an optical sensor and a gas sensor | [2011/28] | French: | Détecteur d'incendie avec un capteur optique et un capteur de gaz | [2011/28] |
Former [2006/37] | Gassensor | ||
Former [2006/37] | Gas sensor | ||
Former [2006/37] | Capteur de gaz | Examination procedure | 25.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 30.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 06.03.2012 | CH | 31.03.2012 | LI | 31.03.2012 | FR | 02.04.2012 | [2013/10] |
Former [2013/07] | CH | 31.03.2012 | |
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4103997 (ARAKI TSUNEHIKO, et al) [A] 7,8 * abstract * * column 1, lines 50-57; figure 2 ** column 2, lines 60-65 *; | [Y]DE4445359 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 3-6,9 * abstract * * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 17 *; | [A]EP0926646 (SIEMENS BUILDING TECH AG [CH]) [A] 7,8 * paragraph [0019] *; | [X]DE19850564 (PREUSSAG AG MINIMAX [DE]) [X] 1,3,5,9 * column 7, lines 45-60; figure 1 * * column 2, lines 21-23 *; | [DA]EP1104884 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1-6,9 * column 6, lines 50-60 *; | [XY]EP1376505 (SIEMENS BUILDING TECH AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * paragraphs [0027] , [0038] , [0048] * [Y] 3-6,9 | Examination | DE19512126 | by applicant | US4103997 | EP0926646 | DE19850564 | EP1376505 |