EP1705386 - Assembly for connecting shaped gripping or supporting elements to a bearing structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M.P.M. SNC di Malini Primo & C. Via Nardi, 132/C Fraz. Sacro Cuore 36060 Romano d'Ezzelino, VI / IT | [2007/12] |
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states Malini, Primo Roberto Via Campagnola, 41/C 36027 Rosa' (VI) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Malini, Primo Roberto Via Campagnola, 41/C 36027 Rosa' (VI) / IT | [2007/12] |
Former [2006/39] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Bonini, Ercole Studio Bonini Srl Corso Fogazzaro, 8 36100 Vicenza / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Bonini, Ercole Studio Bonini Srl Corso Fogazzaro, 8 36100 Vicenza / IT | ||
Former [2006/39] | Bonini, Ercole Corso Fogazzaro, 8 36100 Vicenza / IT | Application number, filing date | 06110861.9 | 08.03.2006 | [2006/39] | Priority number, date | IT2005VI00071 | 15.03.2005 Original published format: IT VI20050071 | [2006/39] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1705386 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1705386 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16B7/04 | [2006/39] | CPC: |
E05B1/0015 (EP);
F16B9/054 (EP,US);
F16B35/048 (EP);
F16B43/00 (EP);
A47B95/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/44] |
Former [2006/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verbindungsanordnung zur Verbindung von Trag- oder Griffformteilen mit einer Tragstruktur | [2006/39] | English: | Assembly for connecting shaped gripping or supporting elements to a bearing structure | [2006/39] | French: | Ensemble de connexion pour connecter des éléments façonnés servant de support ou de poignée à structure porteuse | [2006/39] | Examination procedure | 21.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/08] | 26.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/08] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1145471 (DOBRICK AUGUST C [US]) [A] 1,5 * page 1, line 65 - line 84; figure 3 *; | [X]US2626772 (FLORA LAURENCE H) [X] 1,3,4 * column 2, line 6 - column 5, line 3; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US2745458 (BEDFORD JR WILLIAM A) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 3 - column 4, line 10; figures 1-9 *; | [A]DE1098399 (JEAN MUELLER O H G ELEKTROTECH) [A] 1* figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE3725719 (DIECKMANN DIETER [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,22-24 * column 3, line 17 - column 5, line 3; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE10113907 (KARL LOGGEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 25; figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE20308200U (BRUMMER KLAUS [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,22 * the whole document * |