EP1834722 - RECIPROCATING SAW, TIMING FORK AND GEARBOX FOR USE THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2008 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker, Inc. Drummond Plaza Office Park 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, DE 19711 / US | [2007/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONE, Graham 59 Grinstead Way Carrville Durham, Berkshire DH1 1LY / GB | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Clark, Charles Robert, et al Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | Clark, Charles Robert, et al Black & Decker 210 Bath Road, Slough Berkshire, SL1 3YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06111198.5 | 15.03.2006 | [2007/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1834722 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B23D49/16 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
B23D49/165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/38] | Title | German: | Stichsäge, taktgebende Führungsgabel und Getriebe dafür | [2007/38] | English: | RECIPROCATING SAW, TIMING FORK AND GEARBOX FOR USE THEREWITH | [2007/38] | French: | Scie alternative, fourche de temporisation et transmission associée | [2007/38] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 27.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/44] | 12.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE2650470 (LUTZ EUGEN MASCH) [X] 1-5,7 * page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 7, paragraph L - page 11, paragraph 1 * * figures 1-6 * [A] 6; | [XA]EP0124198 (SKIL NEDERLAND NV [NL]) [X] 1-6 * page 5, paragraph L - page 9, paragraph 1 * * in particular: * * page 8, paragraph 3 * * figures 1,5 * [A] 7; | [XA]US4545123 (HARTMANN JAMES R [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 9 * * figures 1,4 * [A] 7; | [XA]DE29912907U (FESTO TOOLTECHNIC GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,7 * page 11, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * figures 1,4 *[A] 2-6 |