EP1732131 - Assembly adapted to cool a group of power electronic components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/50] | Assembly apted to cool a group of power electronic components | ||
[2009/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSRAM Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | For all designated states Osram Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/50] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Österreich Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hellinger, Leopold Bründlgasse 1 3710, Ziersdorf / AT | 02 /
Neumann, Gerhard Nr. 50 3231, St. Margarethen / AT | [2006/50] | Representative(s) | Peham, Alois Siemens AG Österreich Siemensstrasse 92 1210 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | Peham, Alois Siemens AG Österreich, Siemensstrasse 92 1210 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 06111304.9 | 17.03.2006 | [2006/50] | Priority number, date | AT20050000371U | 06.06.2005 Original published format: AT 3712005 U | [2006/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1732131 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1732131 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1732131 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/367 | [2006/50] | CPC: |
H01L23/3675 (EP);
H01L23/3737 (EP);
H01L23/42 (EP);
H01L21/4878 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP);
H01L2924/09701 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/50] | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Kühlung einer Gruppe von leistungselektronischen Bauelementen | [2006/50] | English: | Assembly adapted to cool a group of power electronic components | [2009/16] | French: | Assemblage pour dissipation de chaleur d'un groupe de composants electroniques de puissance | [2009/16] |
Former [2006/50] | Assembly apted to cool a group of power electronic components | ||
Former [2006/50] | Assemblage pour dissipation de chaleur d'un groupe de composants electroniques à haute prestation | Examination procedure | 18.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 17.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.08.2009 | CZ | 26.08.2009 | DK | 26.08.2009 | EE | 26.08.2009 | FI | 26.08.2009 | IE | 26.08.2009 | IT | 26.08.2009 | LT | 26.08.2009 | LV | 26.08.2009 | NL | 26.08.2009 | PL | 26.08.2009 | RO | 26.08.2009 | SE | 26.08.2009 | SI | 26.08.2009 | SK | 26.08.2009 | TR | 26.08.2009 | BG | 26.11.2009 | GR | 27.11.2009 | ES | 07.12.2009 | IS | 26.12.2009 | PT | 28.12.2009 | HU | 27.02.2010 | LU | 17.03.2010 | BE | 31.03.2010 | CH | 31.03.2010 | LI | 31.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | [2015/22] |
Former [2012/47] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
IT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
TR | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
HU | 27.02.2010 | ||
LU | 17.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
IT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
HU | 27.02.2010 | ||
LU | 17.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
IT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
HU | 27.02.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
IT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
RO | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 26.08.2009 | |
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | FI | 26.08.2009 | |
LT | 26.08.2009 | ||
LV | 26.08.2009 | ||
NL | 26.08.2009 | ||
PL | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IS | 26.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0340520 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US5315480 (SAMAROV VICTOR M [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1300883 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [PA]US2005201063 (LEE HAE-HYUNG [KR], et al) [PA] 1-17 * figures 6,8,9 * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0053] ** paragraph [0073] *; | [PA]US2005276021 (GATES WILLIAM G [GB], et al) [PA] 1-17 * figures 3,4 * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] * | by applicant | EP0340520 |