EP1703573 - Organic thin film transistor, flat display device including the same, and method of manufacturing the organic thin film transistor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2009/09] |
Former [2006/38] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Sung-Jin, c/o Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Koo, Jae-Bon, c/o Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 428-5 Gongse-ri, Giheung-eup, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Suh, Min-Chul, c/o Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2006/42] |
Former [2006/38] | 01 /
Kim, Sung-Jin, c/o Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Koo, Jae-Bon, c/o Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Suh, Min-Chul, c/o Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2006/38] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Scheider Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 06111307.2 | 17.03.2006 | [2006/38] | Priority number, date | KR20050022945 | 19.03.2005 Original published format: KR 2005022945 | KR20050023841 | 22.03.2005 Original published format: KR 2005023841 | [2006/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1703573 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1703573 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/10 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
H10K71/12 (EP,US);
H10K10/466 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/21] |
Former [2006/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Organischer Dünnschichttransistor, Flachbildschirmgerät damit und Verfahren zur Herstellung des organischen Dünnschichttransistors | [2006/38] | English: | Organic thin film transistor, flat display device including the same, and method of manufacturing the organic thin film transistor | [2006/38] | French: | Transistor à couche mince organique, dispositif d'affichage plat comprenant celui-ci et procédé de fabrication du transistor à couche mince organique | [2006/38] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 10.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1033765 (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [Y] 1 * figure 14 *; | [XY]US6413790 (DUTHALER GREGG [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9-14,25 * column 5, line 3; figure 2A * * column 8, lines 40-61 * * column 1, lines 41,42 * [Y] 1; | [X]WO03030278 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1-5,25 * page 5, line 31 - page 6, line 21; figure 1 * * page 9, line 26 *; | [Y]US6603139 (TESSLER NIR [IL], et al) [Y] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]US2004023447 (HIRAKATA YOSHIHARU [JP], et al) [A] 1,26 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1422766 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1,26* figure 1 * | Examination | WO2005069383 |