EP1705159 - INFRARED ABSORBENT GREEN GLASS COMPOSITION AND LAMINATED GLASS INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited 5-27, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited 5-27, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | ||
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 1-7, Kaigan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8552 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGASHIMA, Yukihito NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO., LTD. 5-27, Mita 3-chome, Minato-ku TOKYO 108-6321 / JP | 02 /
MURAKAMI, Harunori NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO., LTD. 5-27, Mita 3-chome, Minato-ku TOKYO 108-6321 / JP | [2016/15] |
Former [2008/28] | 01 /
NAGASHIMA, Yukihito NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO., LTD. 5-27, Mita 3-chome, Minato-ku TOKYO 108-6321 / JP | ||
02 /
MURAKAMI, Harunori NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO., LTD. 5-27, Mita 3-chome, Minato-ku TOKYO 108-6321 / JP | |||
Former [2006/39] | 01 /
NAGASHIMA, Yukihito NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO., LTD. 1-7 Kaigan 2-chome, M TOKYO 105-8552 / JP | ||
02 /
MURAKAMI, Harunori NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO., LTD. 1-7 Kaigan 2-chome, M TOKYO 105-8552 / JP | Representative(s) | Hart-Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2016/15] |
Former [2006/39] | Hart Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06111500.2 | 21.03.2006 | [2006/39] | Priority number, date | JP20050081238 | 22.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005081238 | [2006/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1705159 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1705159 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/087, C03C3/095, C03C4/08, C03C4/02 | [2006/39] | CPC: |
C03C3/087 (EP,US);
C03C3/095 (EP,US);
C03C4/02 (EP,US);
C03C4/082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2016/15] |
Former [2007/22] | DE, FR | ||
Former [2006/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | INFRAROT ABSORBIERENDE GRÜNE GLASZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE LAMINIERTE GLASSCHEIBE | [2015/51] | English: | INFRARED ABSORBENT GREEN GLASS COMPOSITION AND LAMINATED GLASS INCLUDING THE SAME | [2006/39] | French: | COMPOSITION DE VERRE VERT ABSORBANT L'INFRAROUGE ET VERRE FEUILLETE COMPRENANT CETTE DERNIERE | [2006/39] |
Former [2006/39] | INFRAROT ABSORBIERENDE GRÜNE GLASZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND DIESE ENTHALTENDELAMINIERTE GLASSCHEIBE | Examination procedure | 14.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 14.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO2005063643 ; | [X]US2860059 (MOLTER RICHARD C, et al) [X] 1,6,8,10,11,13,14 * column 3, line 31 - line 55 *; | [YA]EP0488110 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 10-12 * column 5, line 20 - column 7, line 11; example -; claim - * [A] 1-9,13-17; | [X]EP1195359 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6,13,14 * examples 1,7 *; | [XY]US6524685 (TORR ASHLEY CARL [GB], et al) [X] 1-9,13-17 * column 4, line 1 - line 3; claim -; tables 1-3 * [Y] 10-12; | [PX]WO2005063643 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [PX] 1-17 * example 9 *; | [PX] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 50, Database accession no. 2005-497880, XP002383307 & WO2005063643 A1 20050714 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD) [PX] 1-17 * abstract * | Examination | EP0297404 | JPS6418938 | EP1705161 |