EP1840548 - Apparatus and method for testing a pressure sensing mat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2011 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IEE INTERNATIONAL ELECTRONICS & ENGINEERING S.A. Zone Industrielle 6468 Echternach / LU | [2007/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gruss, Christian Von der Heydenstrasse 7 54668, Prümzurlay / DE | 02 /
Feustel, Dieter In der Schank, 23b 66663, Merzig / DE | 03 /
Birk, Stefan Hubertusstrasse. 26 54439, Saarburg / DE | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [2009/27] |
Former [2007/40] | Beissel, Jean, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A., 234, route d'Arlon, B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | Application number, filing date | 06111781.8 | 27.03.2006 | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1840548 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1840548 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01L27/00 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
G01L27/005 (EP);
G01L27/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2008/24] |
Former [2007/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Testen einer druckempfindlichen Matte | [2007/40] | English: | Apparatus and method for testing a pressure sensing mat | [2007/40] | French: | Appareil et procédé de test d'un tapis de détection de pression | [2007/40] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 04.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5571973 (TAYLOT GEOFFREY L [CA]) [X] 1-9 * abstract *; | [X]DE19705799 (UNIV DRESDEN TECH [DE]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]US5821415 (FAUST EBERHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]US5900530 (O'BRIEN GARY J [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]US6029524 (KLAUDER PHILIP R [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract *; | [X]US2004074281 (LOBDELL DONN D [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]US2005120773 (OHL CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [X] 1-9* the whole document * |