EP1710887 - Method for setting and displaying the tripping curve of a circuit breaker [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Electrical IP GmbH & Co. KG Airport Center Schönefeld Mittelstrasse 5-5a 12529 Schönefeld / DE | [2016/01] |
Former [2010/26] | For all designated states Eaton Industries GmbH Hein-Moeller-Strasse 7-11 53115 Bonn / DE | ||
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Eaton Industies GmbH Hein-Moeller-Strasse 7-11 53115 Bonn / DE | ||
Former [2006/41] | For all designated states Moeller GmbH Hein-Moeller-Strasse 7-11 53115 Bonn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Paul-Walter Im Fürfeld 24 53773 Hennef / DE | [2006/41] | Representative(s) | Eaton IP Group EMEA c/o Eaton Intellectual Power Limited Eaton House 30 Pembroke Road Dublin 4 / IE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 06111893.1 | 29.03.2006 | [2006/41] | Priority number, date | DE20051016105 | 08.04.2005 Original published format: DE102005016105 | [2006/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1710887 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1710887 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02H3/00, G05B19/10, H02H3/04, H02H3/093, H01H71/00, H01H71/12, H02H3/08 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
H02H3/006 (EP);
G05B19/108 (EP);
H02H3/08 (EP);
H01H2071/006 (EP);
H01H71/123 (EP);
H02H3/04 (EP);
H02H3/0935 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/41] | H02H3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/08] |
Former [2017/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, LI | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, LI | ||
Former [2006/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Ein- und Darstellen der Auslösekennlinie von Schutzschaltern | [2006/41] | English: | Method for setting and displaying the tripping curve of a circuit breaker | [2006/41] | French: | Méthode pour définir et afficher la courbe charactéristique de déclenchment d'un disjoncteuer | [2006/41] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2006 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 02.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/10] | 30.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4245318 (ECKART GREGORY C, et al) [A] 1-8* figures 2,5 *; | [A]EP0634825 (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 1-8 * figures 3,4 *; | [I]DE69013302T (MERLIN GERIN [FR]) [I] 1-8 * the whole document * |