EP1845596 - An electric connection device and a method of producing such a device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Research Ltd Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states ABB Research Ltd Affolternstrasse 52 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Espeseth, Robert Erik Munksvei 17 Skien 3714 / NO | 02 /
Roseen, Patrik sgatan 8C Vasteras 72463 / SE | [2007/42] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2009/43] |
Former [2007/42] | Fröderberg, Anders Oskar BRANN AB P.O. Box 171 92 104 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 06112607.4 | 13.04.2006 | [2007/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1845596 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H02B13/035, H02G15/068, H02G15/22, H01B17/26 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
H02G15/068 (EP,US);
H02G15/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/42] | Title | German: | Elektrische Verbindungsvorrichtung und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer solchen Vorrichtung | [2007/42] | English: | An electric connection device and a method of producing such a device | [2007/42] | French: | Dispositif de connexion électrique et procédé de fabrication d'un tel dispositif | [2007/42] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 21.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/45] | 28.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.11.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE293632 (BROWN, BOVERI & CIE) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB233880 (THOMAS SLOPER) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [X]US3178505 (SICKLE ROSWELL C VAN) [X] 1,6,7,19,25,26 * column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 34; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US3234322 (ADRIANUS FROWEIN EGBERTUS) [X] 1,6,7,19,25,26 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP1496576 (PFISTERER KONTAKTSYST GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,19 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0381638 | FR2769123 | WO2007065912 |