EP1717941 - Electric power converter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [2019/48] |
Former [2017/15] | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zurich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASPLUND, Gunnar Vasagatan 15 S- 771 32 Ludvika / SE | 02 /
PÅLSSON, Rolf Limslagarvägen 6 S- 772 70 Saxdalen / SE | 03 /
SVENSSON, Jan Johanneshöjden 2, 11tr S- 722 19 Västerås / SE | 04 /
LUNDBERG, Peter Jägargatan 6 S- 722 23 Västerås / SE | 05 /
LINDBERG, Johan Mona-Lisa Englundsv. 13 S-415 24 Gothenburg / SE | 06 /
JIANG HÄFNER, Ying Nyponstigen 5E S-771 43 Ludvika / SE | [2019/48] |
Former [2006/44] | 01 /
Asplund, Gunnar Vasagatan 15 771 32, Ludvika / SE | ||
02 /
Jiang Häfner, Ying Nyponstigen 5E 771 43, Ludvika / SE | |||
03 /
Lindberg, Johan Mona-Lisa Englundsv. 13 415 24, Gothenburg / SE | |||
04 /
Lundberg, Peter Jägargatan 6 722 23, Västerås / SE | |||
05 /
Svensson, Jan Johanneshöjden 2, 11tr 722 19, Västerås / SE | |||
06 /
Palsson, Rolf Limslagarvägen 6 772 70, Saxdalen / SE | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [2019/48] |
Former [2012/38] | Ahrengart, Kenneth, et al ABB AB Intellectual Property Ingenjör Bååths Gata 11 721 83 Västerås / SE | ||
Former [2008/33] | Dahlstrand, Björn ABB AB Legal & Compliance/Intellectual Property 721 78 Västeras / SE | ||
Former [2006/44] | Dahlstrand, Björn Legal & Compliance/Intellectual property ABB AB Forskargränd 7 721 78 Västerås / SE | Application number, filing date | 06113334.4 | 29.04.2006 | [2006/44] | Priority number, date | US20050675845P | 29.04.2005 Original published format: US 675845 P | [2006/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1717941 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1717941 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1717941 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/36, H02M5/458, H02M7/5395, H02M7/757, H02M1/00 | [2019/27] | CPC: |
H02M5/4585 (EP,US);
H02J3/36 (EP,US);
H02M1/0054 (EP,US);
H02M7/5395 (EP,US);
H02M7/7575 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US);
Y02E60/60 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/11] | H02M7/00, H02J3/36 | ||
Former IPC [2006/44] | H02M7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/48] |
Former [2006/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrischer Leistungswandler | [2006/44] | English: | Electric power converter | [2006/44] | French: | Convertisseur de puissance électrique | [2006/44] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 17.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2019 | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/45] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 24.11.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 24.11.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.12.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 24.11.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 24.11.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.12.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.04.2006 | AT | 27.11.2019 | CY | 27.11.2019 | CZ | 27.11.2019 | DK | 27.11.2019 | EE | 27.11.2019 | ES | 27.11.2019 | FI | 27.11.2019 | IT | 27.11.2019 | LT | 27.11.2019 | LV | 27.11.2019 | MC | 27.11.2019 | NL | 27.11.2019 | PL | 27.11.2019 | RO | 27.11.2019 | SE | 27.11.2019 | SI | 27.11.2019 | SK | 27.11.2019 | TR | 27.11.2019 | BG | 27.02.2020 | GR | 28.02.2020 | IS | 27.03.2020 | PT | 19.04.2020 | IE | 29.04.2020 | LU | 29.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | AT | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
TR | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
IE | 29.04.2020 | ||
LU | 29.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
IE | 29.04.2020 | ||
LU | 29.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
LU | 29.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AT | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
LU | 29.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AT | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 27.11.2019 | |
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 27.11.2019 | |
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 27.11.2019 | |
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 27.11.2019 | |
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 27.11.2019 | |
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY] - KOLAR J W ET AL, "Minimizing the current harmonics RMS value of three-phase PWM converter systems by optimal and suboptimal transition between continuous and discontinuous modulation", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE. MASSACHUSETTS, 25 - 27 JUNE, 1991; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19910624), vol. CONF. 22, doi:10.1109/PESC.1991.162702, ISBN 978-0-7803-0090-3, pages 372 - 381, XP010048320 [X] 1,13 * page 380 - page 381; figures 1,14 * [A] 17-19 [Y] 2-12,14-16,20,21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PESC.1991.162702 | [YA] - AGELIDIS V G, "A low-distortion multilevel pulse-width modulated inverter topology", INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, 1995. ISIE '95., PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE INTER NATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON ATHENS, GREECE 10-14 JULY 1995, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19950710), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/ISIE.1995.496634, ISBN 978-0-7803-2683-5, pages 243 - 247, XP010161424 [Y] 2-12,14-16,20,21 * page 243 * [A] 1,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISIE.1995.496634 | [X] - HITI S ET AL, "Zero vector modulation method for voltage source inverter operating near zero output frequency", INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE, 2004. 39TH IAS ANNUAL MEETING. CONFE RENCE RECORD OF THE 2004 IEEE SEATTLE, WA, USA 3-7 OCT. 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20041003), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/IAS.2004.1348404, ISBN 978-0-7803-8486-6, pages 171 - 176, XP010735210 [X] 1,13 * page 171 - page 172; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IAS.2004.1348404 | [X] - BLASKO V ET AL, "A new hybrid random pulse width modulator for industrial drives", APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE AND EXPOSITION, 2000.APEC 2000.FIFTEENTH ANNUAL IEEE, IEEE, (20000206), vol. 2, doi:10.1109/APEC.2000.822801, ISBN 978-0-7803-5864-5, pages 932 - 938, XP010371625 [X] 1-13 * pages 932, 935; figure 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APEC.2000.822801 |