EP1726835 - Device for mutually connecting an upright and at least two cross-members converging thereat, particularly for supporting frames [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.2009 [2009/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNOX S.R.L. Via dell'Artigianato 28/30 35010 Vigodarzere (PD) / IT | [2007/50] |
Former [2006/48] | For all designated states Unox S.p.A. Via dell'Artigianato 28/30 35010 Vigodarzere (Padova) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Franzolin, Enrico Via G. Falcone, 52 35010 Vigodarzere (PD) / IT | [2008/24] |
Former [2006/48] | 01 /
Franzolin, Enrico Via G. Falcone, 52 35010 Vigodarzere (PD) / IT | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06113417.7 | 03.05.2006 | [2006/48] | Priority number, date | IT2005PD00151 | 24.05.2005 Original published format: IT PD20050151 | [2006/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1726835 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1726835 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16B7/18, F16B12/50 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
F16B12/50 (EP);
F16B7/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2007/31] |
Former [2006/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum gegenseitigen Verbinden eines Ständers und wenigstens zwei dagegen gerichtete Querriegel, insbesondere für Traggestelle | [2006/48] | English: | Device for mutually connecting an upright and at least two cross-members converging thereat, particularly for supporting frames | [2006/48] | French: | Dispositif de connexion mutuelle d'un montant et d'au moins deux traverses convergeant vers lui, notamment pour des structures de support | [2006/48] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 30.05.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.09.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.07.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1285411 (BRITISH ALUMINIUM CO LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,6-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE202004009888U (KADEYA ENTPR CO [TW]) [Y] 1-3,5-9,11 * abstract *; | [Y]DE19526760 (BAHRO JUERGEN [DE]) [Y] 1-3,5-9,11 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2877602 (LARSEN EINAR R) [A] 1 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 2; figures 1-3,8 *; | [A]US3887288 (GLASER HAROLD) [A] 1 * column 4, line 8 - line 39; figures 6-9 * |