EP1754821 - Pressing arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Frank Carl-Schwenk-Strasse 14-2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2007/08] | Representative(s) | Kunze, Klaus, et al Voith Paper Holding GmbH & Co. KG Abteilung zjp Sankt Poeltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/08] | Kunze, Klaus, et al Voith Paper Holding GmbH & Co. KG Abteilung zjp Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 06114397.0 | 23.05.2006 | [2007/08] | Priority number, date | DE20051038838 | 17.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005038838 | [2007/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1754821 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1754821 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | D21F3/02, D21F3/04 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
D21F3/0218 (EP);
D21F3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/08] | Title | German: | Pressanordnung | [2007/08] | English: | Pressing arrangement | [2007/08] | French: | Dispositif de pressage | [2007/08] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/40] | 09.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.05.2009 | CZ | 20.05.2009 | DK | 20.05.2009 | EE | 20.05.2009 | IE | 20.05.2009 | LT | 20.05.2009 | LV | 20.05.2009 | NL | 20.05.2009 | RO | 20.05.2009 | SI | 20.05.2009 | SK | 20.05.2009 | TR | 20.05.2009 | LU | 23.05.2009 | BE | 31.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | BG | 20.08.2009 | GR | 21.08.2009 | ES | 31.08.2009 | IS | 20.09.2009 | PT | 20.09.2009 | HU | 21.11.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | CZ | 20.05.2009 | |
DK | 20.05.2009 | ||
EE | 20.05.2009 | ||
IE | 20.05.2009 | ||
LT | 20.05.2009 | ||
LV | 20.05.2009 | ||
NL | 20.05.2009 | ||
RO | 20.05.2009 | ||
SI | 20.05.2009 | ||
SK | 20.05.2009 | ||
LU | 23.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
BG | 20.08.2009 | ||
GR | 21.08.2009 | ||
ES | 31.08.2009 | ||
IS | 20.09.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | ||
HU | 21.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 20.05.2009 | |
DK | 20.05.2009 | ||
EE | 20.05.2009 | ||
IE | 20.05.2009 | ||
LT | 20.05.2009 | ||
LV | 20.05.2009 | ||
NL | 20.05.2009 | ||
RO | 20.05.2009 | ||
SI | 20.05.2009 | ||
SK | 20.05.2009 | ||
LU | 23.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
BG | 20.08.2009 | ||
GR | 21.08.2009 | ||
ES | 31.08.2009 | ||
IS | 20.09.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | CZ | 20.05.2009 | |
DK | 20.05.2009 | ||
EE | 20.05.2009 | ||
IE | 20.05.2009 | ||
LT | 20.05.2009 | ||
LV | 20.05.2009 | ||
NL | 20.05.2009 | ||
RO | 20.05.2009 | ||
SI | 20.05.2009 | ||
SK | 20.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
BG | 20.08.2009 | ||
GR | 21.08.2009 | ||
ES | 31.08.2009 | ||
IS | 20.09.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | CZ | 20.05.2009 | |
DK | 20.05.2009 | ||
EE | 20.05.2009 | ||
IE | 20.05.2009 | ||
LT | 20.05.2009 | ||
LV | 20.05.2009 | ||
NL | 20.05.2009 | ||
RO | 20.05.2009 | ||
SI | 20.05.2009 | ||
SK | 20.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
BG | 20.08.2009 | ||
ES | 31.08.2009 | ||
IS | 20.09.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | CZ | 20.05.2009 | |
DK | 20.05.2009 | ||
EE | 20.05.2009 | ||
IE | 20.05.2009 | ||
LT | 20.05.2009 | ||
LV | 20.05.2009 | ||
NL | 20.05.2009 | ||
RO | 20.05.2009 | ||
SI | 20.05.2009 | ||
SK | 20.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
BG | 20.08.2009 | ||
ES | 31.08.2009 | ||
IS | 20.09.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | CZ | 20.05.2009 | |
DK | 20.05.2009 | ||
EE | 20.05.2009 | ||
IE | 20.05.2009 | ||
LT | 20.05.2009 | ||
LV | 20.05.2009 | ||
NL | 20.05.2009 | ||
RO | 20.05.2009 | ||
SI | 20.05.2009 | ||
SK | 20.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
ES | 31.08.2009 | ||
IS | 20.09.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | IE | 20.05.2009 | |
LT | 20.05.2009 | ||
LV | 20.05.2009 | ||
NL | 20.05.2009 | ||
SI | 20.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
ES | 31.08.2009 | ||
IS | 20.09.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | LT | 20.05.2009 | |
LV | 20.05.2009 | ||
NL | 20.05.2009 | ||
SI | 20.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
ES | 31.08.2009 | ||
IS | 20.09.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | LT | 20.05.2009 | |
LV | 20.05.2009 | ||
NL | 20.05.2009 | ||
SI | 20.05.2009 | ||
ES | 31.08.2009 | ||
IS | 20.09.2009 | ||
PT | 20.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4217560 (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]) [X] 1-8 * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 25 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 4 ** figure - * | by applicant | EP0531491 |