EP1727105 - Social alarm unit with speech communication [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TUNSTALL GROUP PLC Whitley Lodge, Whitley Bridge Yorkshire DN14 0HR / GB | [2006/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stone, Richard c/o Tunstall Group Limited Whitley Lodge Whitley Bridge, Yorkshire DN14 0HR / GB | [2006/48] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Ian Michael Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | Robinson, Ian Michael Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 06114559.5 | 25.05.2006 | [2006/48] | Priority number, date | GB20050010840 | 27.05.2005 Original published format: GB 0510840 | [2006/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1727105 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1727105 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | [2008/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1727105 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G08B25/08 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
H04M11/04 (EP,GB);
G08B21/02 (GB);
G08B21/0446 (EP);
G08B25/004 (EP);
G08B25/016 (EP,GB);
G08B25/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/48] | Title | German: | Sozialalarmeinheit mit Sprachkommunikation | [2006/48] | English: | Social alarm unit with speech communication | [2006/48] | French: | Unité d'alarme sociale avec communication de la parole | [2006/48] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 19.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.09.2008 | BE | 10.09.2008 | CY | 10.09.2008 | CZ | 10.09.2008 | DK | 10.09.2008 | EE | 10.09.2008 | FI | 10.09.2008 | IT | 10.09.2008 | LT | 10.09.2008 | LV | 10.09.2008 | NL | 10.09.2008 | PL | 10.09.2008 | RO | 10.09.2008 | SI | 10.09.2008 | SK | 10.09.2008 | TR | 10.09.2008 | BG | 10.12.2008 | SE | 10.12.2008 | GR | 11.12.2008 | IS | 10.01.2009 | PT | 10.02.2009 | HU | 11.03.2009 | IE | 25.05.2009 | LU | 25.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | FR | 02.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LV | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
PL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
GR | 11.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
HU | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 25.05.2009 | ||
LU | 25.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
FR | 02.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LV | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
PL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
GR | 11.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.05.2009 | ||
LU | 25.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
FR | 02.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LV | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
PL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
GR | 11.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
FR | 02.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LV | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
PL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
IE | 25.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
FR | 02.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LV | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LV | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LV | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/28] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LV | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LV | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LV | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 10.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9214333 (MODERN VITALCALL LTD [GB]) [A] 6 * page 7, second paragraph - page 8, last paragraph *; | [X]US5589818 (QUEEN ANDREW [US]) [X] 1-6,8-14,16,17 * column 1, lines 21-24,45-63 * * column 3, lines 23-50 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 48 * * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 7 * * column 5, lines 13-16,20-32 * * figures 2,6 *; | [A]WO9928882 (WERNER HEINZ JOACHIM [DE]) [A] 6* page 8, last paragraph - page 10, second paragraph, figure 1 *; | [X]EP1521436 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,9,10,13,16,17 * paragraphs [0011] - [0015] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraphs [0019] - [0022] * * figures 1-3,13 * | by applicant | US5589818 |