EP1728641 - Ink ejection device, image forming apparatus having the same and method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416 Maetan 3-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | [2006/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jung, Youn-gun 859-604, Seorak Jugong Apartment, Sanbon-dong Gunpo-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2006/49] | Representative(s) | Grey, Ian Michael, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/49] | Grey, Ian Michael, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06114598.3 | 26.05.2006 | [2006/49] | Priority number, date | KR20050045434 | 30.05.2005 Original published format: KR 2005045434 | [2006/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1728641 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1728641 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B41J25/308 | [2006/49] | CPC: |
B41J25/308 (EP,KR,US);
B41J11/008 (KR);
B41J2/135 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2009/12] |
Former [2006/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tintenaustossvorrichtung, Bilderzeugungsgerät damit versehen und Steuerverfahren dafür | [2006/49] | English: | Ink ejection device, image forming apparatus having the same and method thereof | [2006/49] | French: | Dispositif d'éjection d'encre, appareil de formation d'images l'utilisant et sa méthode de commande | [2006/49] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 10.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/49] | 14.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2004358826 (SONY CORP) [X] 1-15,19-24,26-28,31,42-49,52,53,56,57,60-63,71-74 * paragraphs [0005] , [0014] , [0017] , [0019] , [0025] , [0032] - [0034] - [0043] , [0045] - [0049] - [0055] - [0057]; figures 6a,6b,7,10a,10b * [Y] 16-18; | [Y]US6382771 (IKEDA KOUJI [JP], et al) [Y] 16-18,32-34 * figures 2,6,7,12 * * column 6, line 5 - line 7 * * column 7, line 1 - line 18 * * column 10, line 33 - line 45 *; | [Y]EP1428665 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-24,26-28,31-34,42-49,52,53,56,57,60-63,71-74 * paragraphs [0056] , [0063] - [0066] - [0068] , [0103] , [0108] , [0189] , [0190]; figures 4,5a,5b,13,14,19,20 *; | [Y]JPH01222983 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 1-3,5-24,26-28,31-34,42-49,52,53,56,57,60-63,71-74 * abstract *; | [Y]JPS6178659 (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 4,43 * abstract *; | [A]US5992968 (UETSUKI MASAYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-74 * figures 6,7,12 * * column 5, line 57 - column 6, line 1 *; | [A]JPH08108593 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1-74 * paragraphs [0004] , [0006] , [0009] , [0010]; figures 5,6 * |