EP1733879 - Web-fed rotary printing press and process for manufacturing printing plates therefore [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2006/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Röthlein, Ewald Koenig & Bauer AG Rothstr. 17 97282, Retzstadt / DE | [2011/40] |
Former [2006/51] | 01 /
Röthlein, Ewald Koenig & Bauer AG Rothstr. 17 97282, Retzstadt / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/40] | Application number, filing date | 06115144.5 | 08.06.2006 | [2006/51] | Priority number, date | DE20051028424 | 17.06.2005 Original published format: DE102005028424 | DE20051032120 | 07.07.2005 Original published format: DE102005032120 | DE20051039074 | 18.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005039074 | DE20051048918 | 13.10.2005 Original published format: DE102005048918 | [2006/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1733879 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1733879 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | [2011/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1733879 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B41F27/00, B41F5/24 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
B41F27/005 (EP);
B41F5/24 (EP);
B41P2227/11 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/51] | Title | German: | Rollenrotationsdruckmaschine und ein Verfahren zum Herstellen von Druckplatten für eine Rollenrotationsdruckmaschine | [2006/51] | English: | Web-fed rotary printing press and process for manufacturing printing plates therefore | [2006/51] | French: | Machine d'impression rotative à bobines et procédé de fabrication de plaques d'impression pour une telle machine | [2006/51] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 13.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.06.2006 | CY | 05.10.2011 | CZ | 05.10.2011 | DK | 05.10.2011 | EE | 05.10.2011 | FI | 05.10.2011 | IE | 05.10.2011 | IT | 05.10.2011 | LT | 05.10.2011 | LV | 05.10.2011 | NL | 05.10.2011 | PL | 05.10.2011 | RO | 05.10.2011 | SE | 05.10.2011 | SI | 05.10.2011 | SK | 05.10.2011 | TR | 05.10.2011 | BG | 05.01.2012 | GR | 06.01.2012 | ES | 16.01.2012 | IS | 05.02.2012 | PT | 06.02.2012 | AT | 08.06.2012 | LU | 08.06.2012 | BE | 30.06.2012 | CH | 30.06.2012 | LI | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
TR | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
AT | 08.06.2012 | ||
LU | 08.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
TR | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
AT | 08.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
AT | 08.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
IE | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 05.10.2011 | |
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 05.10.2011 | |
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 05.10.2011 | |
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 05.10.2011 | |
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | SI | 05.10.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]DE1611383 (KOENIG & BAUER SCHNELLPRESSFAB) [I] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2-4,7; | [X]US3882775 (LYTLE GERALD H, et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [XY]EP0483685 (B J TRADING KK [JP]) [X] 19 * column 4, line 5 - line 12 * [Y] 2-4,7; | [A]US5205039 (TERNES JAMES [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 31 - column 6, line 27 *; | [A]US6076464 (OKAMURA YUICHI [JP]) [A] 1* column 1, line 5 - line 63 * | by applicant | DE1611383 | EP0483685 | EP0510744 |