EP1734508 - Musical sound waveform synthesizer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 13.10.2010 [2010/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1 Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2007/27] |
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken 430-8650 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Umeyama, Yasuyuki Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP | 02 /
Akazawa, Eiji Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP | [2006/51] | Representative(s) | Kehl, Günther, et al Kehl, Ascherl, Liebhoff & Ettmayr Patentanwälte Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | Kehl, Günther, et al Kehl & Ettmayr Patentanwälte, Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06115276.5 | 12.06.2006 | [2006/51] | Priority number, date | JP20050177859 | 17.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005177859 | JP20050177860 | 17.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005177860 | [2006/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1734508 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1734508 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G10H1/02 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
G10H7/008 (EP,US);
G10H1/02 (EP,US);
G10H2210/095 (EP,US);
G10H2250/035 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/51] | Title | German: | Musiktonwellenformsynthesizer | [2006/51] | English: | Musical sound waveform synthesizer | [2006/51] | French: | Synthétiseur de forme d'onde du son musical | [2006/51] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2006 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 05.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.09.2007 | BE | 19.09.2007 | CH | 19.09.2007 | CY | 19.09.2007 | CZ | 19.09.2007 | DK | 19.09.2007 | EE | 19.09.2007 | FI | 19.09.2007 | LI | 19.09.2007 | LT | 19.09.2007 | LV | 19.09.2007 | NL | 19.09.2007 | PL | 19.09.2007 | RO | 19.09.2007 | SI | 19.09.2007 | SK | 19.09.2007 | TR | 19.09.2007 | BG | 19.12.2007 | SE | 19.12.2007 | GR | 20.12.2007 | ES | 30.12.2007 | IS | 19.01.2008 | PT | 19.02.2008 | HU | 20.03.2008 | FR | 23.05.2008 | IE | 12.06.2008 | LU | 12.06.2008 | [2010/41] |
Former [2010/33] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CY | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
EE | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LT | 19.09.2007 | ||
LV | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
RO | 19.09.2007 | ||
SI | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
BG | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
IS | 19.01.2008 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
FR | 23.05.2008 | ||
IE | 12.06.2008 | ||
LU | 12.06.2008 | ||
Former [2010/02] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CY | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
EE | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LT | 19.09.2007 | ||
LV | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
RO | 19.09.2007 | ||
SI | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
BG | 19.12.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
IS | 19.01.2008 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
FR | 23.05.2008 | ||
IE | 12.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
EE | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LT | 19.09.2007 | ||
LV | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
RO | 19.09.2007 | ||
SI | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
IS | 19.01.2008 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
FR | 23.05.2008 | ||
IE | 12.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LT | 19.09.2007 | ||
LV | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
RO | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
IS | 19.01.2008 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
FR | 23.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
DK | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LT | 19.09.2007 | ||
LV | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
RO | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
IS | 19.01.2008 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LT | 19.09.2007 | ||
LV | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
RO | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
SE | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
IS | 19.01.2008 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LT | 19.09.2007 | ||
LV | 19.09.2007 | ||
NL | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
SK | 19.09.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
ES | 30.12.2007 | ||
IS | 19.01.2008 | ||
PT | 19.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
BE | 19.09.2007 | ||
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LT | 19.09.2007 | ||
LV | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
GR | 20.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/17] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LT | 19.09.2007 | ||
LV | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 19.09.2007 | |
CH | 19.09.2007 | ||
FI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LI | 19.09.2007 | ||
LT | 19.09.2007 | ||
PL | 19.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | FI | 19.09.2007 | |
LT | 19.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | LT | 19.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4694723 (SHINOHARA ISAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [A]US5905223 (GOLDSTEIN MARK [US]) [A] 1-4,7,9 * abstract * * column 1, lines 47-62 * * column 2, lines 21-24 * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 3 * * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 7 *; | [A]US6281423 (SHIMIZU MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-4,7,9 * column 16, line 22 - column 17, line 15; figure 6B *; | [A]US2003154847 (AKAZAWA EIJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4,7,9 * paragraph [0077]; figures 5A,5B * * abstract *; | [A]US2003177892 (AKAZAWA EIJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0082] - [0086] * |