EP1870834 - Support for marked articles and article to be accomodated in such support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.07.2010 [2010/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASSA ABLOY AB P.O. Box 70340 107 23 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states ASSA ABLOY AB Klarabergsviadukten 90 P.O. Box 70340 107 23 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2007/52] | For all designated states Assa Abloy Identification Technology Group AB Klarabergsviadukten 90 10723 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELD, Philippe Sentier des Jordils 13 1802, Corseaux / CH | 02 /
CURTY, Jari-Pascal Rue de la Gare 18 1260, Nyon / CH | 03 /
CORBOZ, Mathias Roentgenstrasse 45 8005, Zurich / CH | [2007/52] | Representative(s) | Grosfillier, Philippe ANDRE ROLAND SA IP Attorneys & Services Avenue Collonges 21 1004 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/52] | Grosfillier, Philippe Andre Roland S.A. Intellectual Property Services Avenue Tissot 15 P.O. Box 1255 1001 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 06115738.4 | 20.06.2006 | [2007/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1870834 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/08 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
G06K7/10178 (EP,US);
G06K7/10336 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/52] | Title | German: | Halterung für markierte Artikel und in einer derartigen Halterung untergebrachter Artikel | [2007/52] | English: | Support for marked articles and article to be accomodated in such support | [2007/52] | French: | Support pour articles marqués et articles à adapter à un tel support | [2007/52] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 06.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/27] | 08.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0247015 (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR], et al) [X] 1-12 * figure 5 *; | [A]FR2853982 (ALCEA [FR]) [A] 1-12 * figure 3 *; | [A]US2006044769 (FORSTER IAN J [GB], et al) [A] 1,7* figure 6 * | by applicant | EP0931295 | EP0977145 | US2004069856 | US2006044769 | FR2878053 |