EP1737072 - Cable connection system for battery connectors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABERTAX RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LTD. KW 17 A Corradino Ind. Estate Paola, PLA 08 / MT | [2006/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Werner Wildentenweg 9 86938, Schondorf / DE | 02 /
Pulé, Joe 85, Hilda Tabone Street Vittoriosa / MT | 03 /
Schembri, George 135/2 Anglu Mallia Street Birkirkara / MT | 04 /
Cilia, Joseph Triq il-Baruni V. Azzopardi Zebbug / MT | 05 /
Scicluna, Mark 86, Azalea Triq Leli Camilleri Zurrieq ZRQ 06 / MT | 06 /
Tabone, Malcolm 17, Block D Mountbatten Street Blata l'Bajda HMR 02 / MT | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | Gustorf, Gerhard Bachstrasse 6a 84036 Landshut / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | Gustorf, Gerhard Patentanwalt, Bachstrasse 6 A 84036 Landshut / DE | Application number, filing date | 06115831.7 | 21.06.2006 | [2006/52] | Priority number, date | DE20052009694U | 21.06.2005 Original published format: DE 202005009694 U | DE20052019661U | 14.12.2005 Original published format: DE 202005019661 U | [2006/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1737072 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1737072 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01R11/28, H01R4/34, // H01R13/52, H01R4/30 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
H01R4/34 (EP);
H01R11/286 (EP);
H01R11/283 (EP);
H01R11/284 (EP);
H01R11/287 (EP);
H01R13/5202 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2006/52] | H01R11/28, H01R4/34 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/33] |
Former [2006/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verbindungssystem für Batterieverbindern | [2006/52] | English: | Cable connection system for battery connectors | [2006/52] | French: | Système de connexion pour connecteurs de batterie | [2006/52] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/49] | 10.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5620338 (STEPHENS JAN [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [Y]DE3736414 (ROSE WALTER GMBH & CO KG) [Y] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [Y]WO9844575 (STOCCHIERO OLIMPIO [IT]) [Y] 1-13 * claim 1 *; | [Y]GB1481670 (PETTERSSON B) [Y] 1-13 * figures 1-11 *; | [Y]US5842894 (MEHLBERG REINHARD [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]DE19602523 (HAUSEN AUTO KABEL GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * figures 1-7 * |