EP1703647 - Physical channel configuration signaling procedures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Interdigital Technology Corporation 3411 Silverside Road Concord Plaza, Suite 105 Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | For all designated states Interdigital Technology Corporation 3411 Silverside Road, Concord Plaza, Suite 105 Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Terry, Stephen E. 15 Summit Avenue Northport, NY 11768 / US | 02 /
Dick, Stephen G. 61 Bobann Drive Nesconset, NY 11767 / US | 03 /
Miller, James M. 18 Louisburg Square Verona, NJ 07044 / US | 04 /
Zeira, Eldad 239 West Neck Road Huntington, NY 11743 / US | 05 /
Zeira, Ariela 239 West Neck Road Huntington, NY 11743 / US | [2006/38] | Representative(s) | Pierrou, Mattias Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | Pierrou, Mattias Awapatent AB, P.O. Box 45 086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 06115855.6 | 13.05.2002 | [2006/38] | Priority number, date | US20010290717P | 14.05.2001 Original published format: US 290717 P | US20010029651 | 21.12.2001 Original published format: US 29651 | [2006/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1703647 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1703647 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/212, H04B7/216, H04J13/00, H04B7/26 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
H04J13/16 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04B7/2618 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04W72/23 (KR);
H04J11/00 (KR);
H04W72/0446 (KR);
H04W72/0466 (KR);
H04J2011/0006 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2006/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Konfiguration von physischen Kanälen | [2006/38] | English: | Physical channel configuration signaling procedures | [2006/38] | French: | Procédures de signalement de configuration d'un canal physique | [2006/38] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 19.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.01.2009 | 23.01.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.01.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.01.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02736756.4 / EP1388224 | Divisional application(s) | EP09166057.1 / EP2124354 | EP12172056.9 / EP2547010 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.07.2009 | BE | 22.07.2009 | CY | 22.07.2009 | TR | 22.07.2009 | GR | 23.10.2009 | PT | 22.11.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/37] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CY | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | AT | 22.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9315573 (MILLICOM HOLDINGS UK LTD [GB]) [Y] 4-7,13-16 * page 2, line 20 - line 25 * * page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 9 * * page 8, line 19 - line 23 * * page 14, line 26 - page 15, line 4 * * page 27, line 10 - line 12 * * page 27, line 22 - line 25 * * page 28, line 34 - line 36 * * claim 12 *; | [A]EP0841763 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] * claim 31 *; | [XY] - NOKIA, "HSDPA related signaling parameters in downlink - Tdoc 12A010005", TSG-RAN WG1ADHOC ON HSDPA, SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS, FRANCE, (20010405), XP002290532 [X] 1-3,8-12,17-20 * Section 2.4), "Code channels in case of code multiplexing * [Y] 4,13 | [XY] - MOTOROLA, "HSDPA signaling requirements - R2-A010015", TSG-RAN WG2, EDINBURGH, UK, (20010115), XP002290533 [X] 1-3,8-12,17-20 * Sections 2.0-3.1.1 * [Y] 4-7,13-16 | [A] - PRASAD, RAMJEE ET AL, Third generation mobile communications systems: ISBN 1-58053-082-6, BOSTON, LONDON, ARTECH HOUSE, (2000), XP002290534 [A] * page 68 * * page 327, paragraph 10.2 * * page 329 * |