EP1873367 - Method for operating a combustion engine having a four-way catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Fairlane Plaza South Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Fairlane Plaza South Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Balenovic, Mario Heezerweg 379 5645 KT, Eindhoven / AN | 02 /
Carberry, Brendan Wildbacher Mühle 57 52074, Aachen / DE | 03 /
Dubkov, Alexei Beethovenstr. 11 52064, Aachen / DE | 04 /
Harmsen, Jan Clovisstraat 7 6369 BX, Simpelveld / NL | 05 /
Schneider, Matthew Lütticher Strasse 174 52064, Aachen / DE | 06 /
Yacoub, Yasser Mohammed Sayed Ackerwinde 19 50858, Köln / DE | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Drömer, Hans-Carsten Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung NH/DRP Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | Drömer, Hans-Carsten Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung NH/DRP, Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 06116032.1 | 26.06.2006 | [2008/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1873367 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1873367 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/08, B01D53/94, F01N3/035, F01N3/20 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
F01N3/2033 (EP);
B01D53/9409 (EP);
B01D53/9495 (EP);
F01N13/009 (EP);
F01N3/035 (EP);
F01N3/0814 (EP);
F01N3/0821 (EP);
F01N3/103 (EP);
F02D41/028 (EP);
F02D41/029 (EP);
B01D2258/012 (EP);
F01N2430/085 (EP);
F01N2610/03 (EP);
F02D41/0055 (EP);
F02D41/024 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/37] |
Former [2008/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Brennkraftmaschine mit einem Vier-Wege-Katalysator | [2008/01] | English: | Method for operating a combustion engine having a four-way catalyst | [2008/01] | French: | Procédé de fonctionnement de moteur à combustion avec catalyseur à quatre voies | [2008/01] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 03.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1170472 (KEMIRA METALKAT OY [FI]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0033]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2003140621 (KHAIR MAGDI K [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0019]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2004061278 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1* page 15, paragraph 2; figure 1 *; | [A]DE102004052256 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0032]; figure 1 * |