EP1739540 - Control of offline printing requests [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Young-ju 209-9 Maetan 4-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2007/01] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06116102.2 | 26.06.2006 | [2007/01] | Priority number, date | KR20050056939 | 29.06.2005 Original published format: KR 2005056939 | [2007/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1739540 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1739540 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
G06F3/1259 (EP,US);
G06F3/12 (KR);
G06F3/1207 (EP,US);
G06F3/121 (EP,US);
G06F3/1231 (EP,US);
G06F3/1284 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2011/19] |
Former [2007/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Steuerung von Offline-Druckaufträgen | [2007/01] | English: | Control of offline printing requests | [2007/01] | French: | Contrôle de demandes d'impression hors ligne | [2007/01] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 08.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.04.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/23] | 27.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6288790 (YELLEPEDDY KRISHNA KISHORE [US], et al) [X] 2,4-7,12,13 * column 2, lines 5-31 * * column 2, line 58 - column 4, line 58 * * column 5, line 23 - column 9, line 39 ** figures 2A, 3A-4B * | by applicant | US6288790 |