EP1739978 - Parallax barrier and three dimensional display device using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2009/09] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAM, Hui Legal & IP Team, Samsung SDI Co., LTD., 428-5, Gongsae-dong, Kiheung-gu Yongin-si, Kyunggi-do / KR | 02 /
LEE, Jang-Doo Legal & IP Team, Samsung SDI Co., LTD., 428-5, Gongsae-dong, Kiheung-gu Yongin-si, Kyunggi-do / KR | 03 /
JANG, Hyoung-Wook Legal & IP Team, Samsung SDI Co., LTD., 428-5, Gongsae-dong, Kiheung-gu Yongin-si Kyunggi-do / KR | 04 /
KIM, Beom-Shik Legal & IP Team, Samsung SDI Co., LTD., 428-5, Gongsae-dong, Kiheung-gu Yongin-si Kyunggi-do / KR | 05 /
SONG, Myoung-Seop Legal & IP Team, Samsung SDI Co., LTD., 428-5, Gongsae-dong, Kiheung-gu Yongin-si, Kyunggi-do / KR | [2011/24] |
Former [2007/08] | 01 /
NAM, Hui Legal & IP Team, Samsung SDI Co., LTD., 428-5, Go Kyunggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
LEE, Jang-Doo Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. Legal & IP Team 428-5, Gongsae-dong, Kiheung-gu Yongin-si, Kyunggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
JANG, Hyoung-Wook Legal & IP Team, Samsung SDI Co., LTD., 428-5, Go Kyunggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
KIM, Beom-Shik Legal & IP Team, Samsung SDI Co., LTD., 428-5, Go Kyunggi-do / KR | |||
05 /
SONG, Myoung-Seop Legal & IP Team, Samsung SDI Co., LTD., 428-5, Go Kyunggi-do / KR | |||
Former [2007/01] | 01 /
NAM, Hui Legal & IP Team, Samsung SDI Co., LTD., 428-5, Go Kyunggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
LEE, Jang-Doo Legal & IP Team, Samsung SDI Co., LTD., 428-5, Go Kyunggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
JANG, Hyoung-Wook Legal & IP Team, Samsung SDI Co., LTD., 428-5, Go Kyunggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
KIM, Beom-Shik Legal & IP Team, Samsung SDI Co., LTD., 428-5, Go Kyunggi-do / KR | |||
05 /
SONG, Myoung-Seop Legal & IP Team, Samsung SDI Co., LTD., 428-5, Go Kyunggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2007/01] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 06116111.3 | 27.06.2006 | [2007/01] | Priority number, date | KR20050056826 | 29.06.2005 Original published format: KR 2005056826 | [2007/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1739978 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1739978 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | [2007/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1739978 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
H04N13/31 (EP,US);
H04N13/324 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2007/47] |
Former [2007/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Parallaxbarriere und entsprechende dreidimensionale Bildwiedergabeeinrichtung | [2007/01] | English: | Parallax barrier and three dimensional display device using the same | [2007/01] | French: | Barrière de parallaxe et dispositif d'affichage 3D correspondant | [2011/06] |
Former [2007/01] | Barrière de parallaxe et dispositif d'affichage correspondant | Examination procedure | 27.06.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 26.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2007 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 17.08.2011 | [2012/08] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0833183 (SHARP KK [JP]) [Y] 6-8,13 * column 8, line 3 - line 15 * * column 9, line 39 - column 11, line 20 * * figures 5,9 *; | [XY]GB2405545 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1-5,10-12,16-19 * page 10, line 6 - line 28 * * page 13, line 22 - line 28 * * page 22, line 13 - line 24 * * claims 4,5 * * figures 9,21b,23b * [Y] 6-9,13-15; | [Y]GB2405542 (SHARP KK [JP]) [Y] 9,14,15 * figures 6a,16a * * page 10, line 4 - line 11 * * page 14, line 21 - line 26 * * column 18, line 26 - line 28 ** page 24, line 17 - line 26 * |