EP1741503 - Method of manufacturing a rocker arm [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OTICS Corporation 10 Hamadashimo Nakabata Nishio City Aichi Prefecture 444-0392 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | For all designated states OTICS Corporation 10 Hamadashimo, Nakabata Nishio City Aichi Prefecture 444-0392 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOZAKI, Eiichi OTICS CORPORATION 10, Hamadashimo, Nakabata-cho, N Aichi-ken Aichi 444-0392 / JP | 02 /
KUWAHARA, Kenkichi OTICS CORPORATION 10, Hamadashimo, Nakabata-cho, N Aichi-ken Aichi 444-0392 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Satoshi OTICS CORPORATION 10, Hamadashimo, Nakabata-cho, N Aichi-ken Aichi 444-0392 / JP | [2007/02] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/02] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06116312.7 | 29.06.2006 | [2007/02] | Priority number, date | JP20050195202 | 04.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005195202 | [2007/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1741503 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1741503 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B21K3/00 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
B21K1/205 (EP,US);
F01L1/185 (EP,US);
F01L2303/00 (EP,US);
F01L2305/00 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49295 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5116 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20882 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Kipphebels | [2007/02] | English: | Method of manufacturing a rocker arm | [2007/02] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un culbuteur | [2007/02] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 21.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.05.2009 | BE | 13.05.2009 | CY | 13.05.2009 | CZ | 13.05.2009 | DK | 13.05.2009 | EE | 13.05.2009 | FI | 13.05.2009 | IT | 13.05.2009 | LT | 13.05.2009 | LV | 13.05.2009 | PL | 13.05.2009 | RO | 13.05.2009 | SI | 13.05.2009 | SK | 13.05.2009 | TR | 13.05.2009 | IE | 29.06.2009 | LU | 29.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | BG | 13.08.2009 | SE | 13.08.2009 | GR | 14.08.2009 | ES | 24.08.2009 | IS | 13.09.2009 | PT | 13.09.2009 | HU | 14.11.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
BE | 13.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
IT | 13.05.2009 | ||
LT | 13.05.2009 | ||
LV | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 29.06.2009 | ||
LU | 29.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
GR | 14.08.2009 | ||
ES | 24.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
HU | 14.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
BE | 13.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
IT | 13.05.2009 | ||
LT | 13.05.2009 | ||
LV | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 29.06.2009 | ||
LU | 29.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
GR | 14.08.2009 | ||
ES | 24.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
BE | 13.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
IT | 13.05.2009 | ||
LT | 13.05.2009 | ||
LV | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 29.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
GR | 14.08.2009 | ||
ES | 24.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
BE | 13.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
LT | 13.05.2009 | ||
LV | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 29.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
GR | 14.08.2009 | ||
ES | 24.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
BE | 13.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
LT | 13.05.2009 | ||
LV | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
IE | 29.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
ES | 24.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
BE | 13.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
LT | 13.05.2009 | ||
LV | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
BG | 13.08.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
ES | 24.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
BE | 13.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2009 | ||
DK | 13.05.2009 | ||
EE | 13.05.2009 | ||
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
LT | 13.05.2009 | ||
LV | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
RO | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SK | 13.05.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
ES | 24.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
LT | 13.05.2009 | ||
LV | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
ES | 24.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | AT | 13.05.2009 | |
FI | 13.05.2009 | ||
LT | 13.05.2009 | ||
LV | 13.05.2009 | ||
PL | 13.05.2009 | ||
SI | 13.05.2009 | ||
SE | 13.08.2009 | ||
ES | 24.08.2009 | ||
IS | 13.09.2009 | ||
PT | 13.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH10328778 ; | [DA]JP2004358530 ; | [A]JPH07269311 ; | [A]US6151948 (ASHWORTH MARTIN J [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5 * column 8, line 26 - line 54; figure - *; | [A]EP1450007 (NSK LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3* paragraph [0017]; figure 7 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, & JP10328778 A 19981215 (SAGA TEKKOSHO:KK; SAKAMURA KIKAI SEISAKUSHO:KK) [DA] 1-3,5 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2004358530 A 20041224 (NSK LTD; NSK STEERING SYSTEMS CO LTD) [DA] 1-3,5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP07269311 A 19951017 (NIPPON PISTON RING CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract * |