EP1876305 - Mixing faucet with switching from automatic to manual control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wang, Hsiang Hung No. 15, Puwei Lane Lugang Township Changhua County / TW | [2008/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/11] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/02] | Dokter, Eric-Michael Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06116807.6 | 07.07.2006 | [2008/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1876305 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/05, F16K11/076 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
E03C1/05 (EP);
F16K11/0746 (EP);
F16K11/076 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/02] | Title | German: | Mischbatterie mit Umschaltung von automatischer auf manuelle Steuerung | [2008/02] | English: | Mixing faucet with switching from automatic to manual control | [2008/02] | French: | Robinet mélangeur avec commutation de la commande automatique à manuelle | [2008/02] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 04.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/09] | 22.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0245577 (DMP ELECTRONICS SRL [IT]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4709728 (YING-CHUNG CHEN [TW]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]GB2206397 (CHONG LIH ELECTRIC INDUSTRY CO) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]GB2226105 (HYDROTEK CORP [TW]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US5358213 (PILOLLA JOSEPH J [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE19623104 (YMOS AG IND PRODUKTE [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2001011389 (PHILIPPS-LIEBICH HARTWICH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE202004018943U (WANG HSIANG HUNG [TW]) [A] 1,3 * abstract *; | [A]US6883541 (HWANG SU [TW]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | TW267382B |