EP1879360 - Maintaining corporate contact information in mobile terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sysopen Digia Oyj Hiomotie 19 00380 Helsinki / FI | [2008/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kölbl, Wolfgang Kaivotie 23 as 1 01900, Nurmijärvi / FI | 02 /
Tulonen, Kai Ajomiehenkuja 4 G 02940, Espoo / FI | 03 /
Siivola, Juha Kasarmikatu 20 A 5 00130, Helsinki / FI | [2008/03] | Representative(s) | Pykälä, Timo Tapani Kolster OY Ab Elektroniikkatie 8 90590 Oulu / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2008/03] | Pykälä, Timo Tapani Kolster Oy Ab, P.O. Box 148, Iso Roobertinkatu 23 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 06116878.7 | 10.07.2006 | [2008/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1879360 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/12, G06Q10/00 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/39] |
Former [2008/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verwaltung von Geschäftskontaktinformationen in einem mobilen Endgerät | [2008/03] | English: | Maintaining corporate contact information in mobile terminal | [2008/03] | French: | Maintien des informations de contact d'entreprise dans un terminal mobile | [2008/03] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/03] | 28.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003220966 (HEPPER STEFAN ALFONS [DE], et al) [X] 1,8-17 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0024] , [0029] *; | [X]US2003236842 (NATARAJAN KRISHNAMURTI [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * figures 1,4 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0018] , [0025] , [0042] - [0048] *; | [X]EP1560144 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-17 * figures 3,6 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0011] , [0018] - [0020] - [0024] - [0030] - [0039] *; | [A]WO2006036206 (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE], et al) [A] 1,3,4,9,14-16* paragraphs [0020] , [0024] , [0032] , [0038] * |