EP1879127 - User authentication method and system and password management system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cipherstone Technologies AB Orustgatan 16 414 74 Göteborg / SE | [2008/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jonsson, Kenneth c/o Karl-Evert Jonsson Konstmästaregatan 30 46155, Trollhättan / SE | [2008/03] | Representative(s) | Lind, Urban Arvid Oskar Awapatent AB Södra Hamngatan 37-41 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/03] | Lind, Urban Arvid Oskar AWAPATENT AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 06117117.9 | 13.07.2006 | [2008/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1879127 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/20 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
G07F7/1025 (EP,US);
G06F21/36 (EP,US);
G06V40/171 (EP,US);
G06V40/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/03] | Title | German: | Benutzerauthentifizierungsmethode und -system und Passwortverwaltungssystem | [2008/03] | English: | User authentication method and system and password management system | [2008/03] | French: | Procédé et système d'autentification de l'utilisateur et système de gestion de mot de passe | [2008/03] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 16.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/31] | 09.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 28.04.2009 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0677801 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1422589 (AVIMIR LLC [US]) [X] 1-20 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0035] *; | [A]US2004230843 (JANSEN WAYNE [US]) [A] 1-20* paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0036] * |