EP1754917 - Centering element for magnetic valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uhlenbrock, Dietmar Pfarrstr. 68 70734, Fellbach / DE | 02 /
Bellot, Marc-Olivier Rotenwaldstr. 29 70197, Stuttgart / DE | [2007/08] | Application number, filing date | 06117191.4 | 14.07.2006 | [2007/08] | Priority number, date | DE20051038751 | 17.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005038751 | [2007/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1754917 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1754917 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/06 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
F16K31/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2007/43] |
Former [2007/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zentrierelemente für Magnetventil | [2007/08] | English: | Centering element for magnetic valve | [2007/08] | French: | Elément de centrage pour soupape magnétique | [2007/08] | Examination procedure | 21.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/40] | 20.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH1174118 (TOYOOKI KOGYO KK) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure 1 * [Y] 3; | [XY]DE4410157 (REXROTH MANNESMANN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * figure 1 * [Y] 3; | [X]DE3147062 (STAIGER BRUNO, et al) [X] 1,4 * figure - *; | [X]DE10146497 (EKS ELEKTROMAGNETIK DR SCHEUER [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | JPH1174118 | DE4410157 |