EP1744035 - Exhaust gas purifying apparatus for an internal combustion engine and corresponding method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2007/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawai, Kenji Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Hisanobu Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2007/03] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/03] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06117225.0 | 14.07.2006 | [2007/03] | Priority number, date | JP20050206025 | 14.07.2005 Original published format: JP 2005206025 | [2007/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1744035 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1744035 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F02D9/04, F02D21/08, F02D41/00, F02D41/02, F01N3/20, F02M25/07, // F01N3/08 | [2007/03] | CPC: |
F01N13/011 (EP,US);
F01N3/0814 (EP,US);
F01N3/0842 (EP,US);
F01N3/206 (EP,US);
F02B37/002 (EP,US);
F02B37/007 (EP,US);
F02D23/00 (EP,US);
F02D41/0007 (EP,US);
F02D41/0055 (EP,US);
F02D41/027 (EP,US);
F02D41/1445 (EP,US);
F02D9/04 (EP,US);
F02M26/08 (EP,US);
F02M26/38 (EP,US);
F02M26/43 (EP,US);
F01N13/107 (EP,US);
F01N2410/04 (EP,US);
F01N2410/12 (EP,US);
F02B37/22 (EP,US);
F02M26/10 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/38] |
Former [2007/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Abgasreinigungsvorrichtung für eine Brennkraftmaschine und entsprechendes Verfahren | [2007/03] | English: | Exhaust gas purifying apparatus for an internal combustion engine and corresponding method | [2007/03] | French: | Dispositif de purification de gaz d'échappement pour un moteur à combustion interne et procédé correspondant | [2007/03] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2006 | Examination requested [2007/03] | 01.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 23.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/35] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 23.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 23.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE19914787 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1,3,4,10-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1308617 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP]) [A] 1,3,10,12 * claim 8 ** figure 1 *; | [A]EP1498594 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,4,5,8,10,12 * paragraphs [0021] - [0033] * * figures 1,2 * |