EP1746517 - XPath automaton systems and methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.05.2010 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A Rochester, NY 14644 / US | [2007/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roux, Claude 22, Rue Edouard Vaillant 38100, Grenoble / FR | [2007/04] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06117377.9 | 18.07.2006 | [2007/04] | Priority number, date | US20050184484 | 19.07.2005 Original published format: US 184484 | [2007/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1746517 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1746517 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/22 | [2007/04] | CPC: |
G06F16/81 (EP,US);
G06F40/137 (EP,US);
G06F40/143 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/33] |
Former [2007/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren für XPath-Automat | [2007/04] | English: | XPath automaton systems and methods | [2007/04] | French: | Système et procédé d'automate XPath | [2007/04] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 06.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.03.2010 | 21.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/23] | 31.01.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/23] | 10.03.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - HAMMERSCHMIDTH B C ET AL, "Comparisons and Performance Measurement of XML Index Structures", UNIVERSITÄT ZU LÜBECK - SCHRIFTENREIHE DER INSTITUTE FÜR INFORMATIK/MATHEMATIK, no. A-05-19, (200503), URL: http://www.ifis.mu-luebeck.de/~ifis/public/2005/keyx_TR-A-05-19.pdf, (20071009), XP002454123 [X] 1-10 * abstract * * section 2.3 * * section 2.4 * * section 2.5; figures 2, 3 * * section 2.6 * * section 2.7 * | [X] - COOPER B F ET AL, "A fast index for semistructured data", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON VERY LARGE DATA BASES, (2001), pages 341 - 350, XP002303292 [X] 1-10 * section 2; figure 2 * * section 3; figures 3,4 * | [X] - MILO T ET AL, "INDEX STRUCTURES FOR PATH EXPRESSIONS", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (1999), vol. 1540, ISSN 0302-9743, pages 277 - 295, XP001221989 [X] 1-10 * section 3 * * section 4 * * section 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-49257-7_18 | [A] - GOLDMAN R ET AL, "DataGuides: Enabling Query Formulation and Optimization in Semistructured Databases", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON VERY LARGE DATA BASES, (19970826), pages 436 - 445, XP002248314 [A] 1,8,10 * section 2 * | [T] - ANONYMOUS, "Trie", ONLINE WIKIPEDIA PUBLICATION, URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Trie, (20071008), XP002454124 [T] 1,8,10 * the whole document * |