EP1746051 - Movement device for a store [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilsider srl Fr. Miralduolo, 56 06089 Torgiano (PG) / IT | [2007/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ceccarelli, Gildo Via A. Manzoni, 391 06087, Ponte S. Giovanni (PG) / IT | [2007/04] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 06117530.3 | 20.07.2006 | [2007/04] | Priority number, date | IT2005UD00122 | 21.07.2005 Original published format: IT UD20050122 | [2007/04] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1746051 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/10, B65G1/04 | [2007/04] | CPC: |
B65G1/10 (EP);
B65G1/0442 (EP);
B65G2201/0217 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/04] | Title | German: | Bewegungsvorrichtung für ein Regallager | [2007/04] | English: | Movement device for a store | [2007/04] | French: | Dispositif de mouvement pour un magasin à rayonnage | [2007/04] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 27.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/02] | 28.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1232884 (SALZGITTER STAHLBAU GMBH) [X] 1,3,5-7 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 39 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE19813291 (GUENTHER ROLAND [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]CH408777 (PRESS UND STANZWERK AG [LI]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |