EP1717223 - Method for the purification of isocyanates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2022 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2023/01] |
Former [2016/29] | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wölfert, Andreas BASF Aktiengesellschaft Kärlegartenstr. 12 74906, Bad Rappenau / DE | 02 /
Pallasch, Hans-Jürgen BASF Aktiengesellschaft Am Kleisinger 29 67169, Kallstadt / DE | 03 /
Stroefer, Eckhard BASF Aktiengesellschaft Karl-Kuntz-Weg 9 68163, Mannheim / DE | 04 /
Blankertz, Heinrich-Josef BASF Aktiengesellschaft Im Elster 18 67147, Forst / DE | [2016/29] |
Former [2006/44] | 01 /
Wölfert, Andreas BASF Aktiengesellschaft Kärlegartenstr. 12 74906, Bad Rappenau / DE | ||
02 /
Pallasch, Hans-Jürgen BASF Aktiengesellschaft Am Kleisinger 29 67169, Kallstadt / DE | |||
03 /
Stroefer, Eckhard BASF Aktiengesellschaft Karl-Kuntz-Weg 9 68163, Mannheim / DE | |||
04 /
Blankertz, Heinrich-Josef BASF Aktiengesellschaft Im Elster 18 67147, Forst / DE | Representative(s) | Ellwanger, Arndt, et al Ellwanger & Baier Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Friedrichsplatz 9 68165 Mannheim / DE | [2023/01] |
Former [2016/29] | BASF IP Association BASF SE ZRX-C6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06118257.2 | 16.12.2003 | [2006/44] | Priority number, date | DE20021060092 | 19.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10260092 | [2006/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1717223 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1717223 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | [2009/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1717223 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/29] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1717223 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07C263/10, C07C263/20, C07C265/14 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
B01D3/141 (EP,KR,US);
C07C263/20 (EP,KR,US);
C07C263/10 (EP,KR,US);
C07C265/14 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C263/10, C07C265/14 (EP,US);
C07C263/20, C07C265/14 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/29] |
Former [2006/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reinigung von Isocyanaten | [2006/44] | English: | Method for the purification of isocyanates | [2006/44] | French: | Procédé de purification d'isocyanates | [2006/44] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 18.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03789289.0 / EP1575907 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030789289) is 17.05.2006 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.04.2017
12.04.2017
ADMISSIBLE The Dow Chemical Company Intellectual Property 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road Midland, MI 48640 / US Opponent's representative Beck Greener LLP, et al, et al Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.04.2017
12.04.2017
ADMISSIBLE The Dow Chemical Company Intellectual Property 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road Midland, MI 48640 / US Opponent's representative Beck Greener, et al, et al Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | 30.05.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.10.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.09.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.10.2018 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.10.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.06.2022 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.11.2022 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 18.12.2018 | Appeal received No. T3018/18 | 26.02.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.06.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 23.09.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 21.12.2018 | Appeal received No. T3018/18 | 18.02.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.01.2021 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2021/03] | 02.06.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 23.09.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 02.06.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2003 | CY | 20.07.2016 | CZ | 20.07.2016 | DK | 20.07.2016 | EE | 20.07.2016 | ES | 20.07.2016 | FI | 20.07.2016 | IT | 20.07.2016 | MC | 20.07.2016 | NL | 20.07.2016 | RO | 20.07.2016 | SE | 20.07.2016 | SI | 20.07.2016 | SK | 20.07.2016 | TR | 20.07.2016 | BG | 20.10.2016 | GR | 21.10.2016 | PT | 21.11.2016 | AT | 16.12.2016 | GB | 16.12.2016 | IE | 16.12.2016 | LU | 16.12.2016 | BE | 31.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | FR | 02.01.2017 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 16.12.2003 | |
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
AT | 16.12.2016 | ||
GB | 16.12.2016 | ||
IE | 16.12.2016 | ||
LU | 16.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 20.07.2016 | |
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
AT | 16.12.2016 | ||
GB | 16.12.2016 | ||
IE | 16.12.2016 | ||
LU | 16.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 20.07.2016 | |
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
GB | 16.12.2016 | ||
IE | 16.12.2016 | ||
LU | 16.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 20.07.2016 | |
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 16.12.2016 | ||
LU | 16.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | CZ | 20.07.2016 | |
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 20.07.2016 | |
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | CZ | 20.07.2016 | |
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 20.07.2016 | |
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 20.07.2016 | |
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 20.07.2016 | |
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]US3140305 (LOWENSTEIN JACK G) [DX] 1-10 * column 4, lines 37-69 *; | [DX]US3410888 (HAMMOND PHILIP D) [DX] 1-10 * claim 1 * * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 5 * * column 1, lines 52-59 * * examples 1-3 *; | [X]US3471543 (SAYIGH ADNAN A R) [X] 1-10 * figure 2 * * column 10, line 12 * * column 9, lines 6-34 * * column 6, lines 6-15 *; | [DX]US4216063 (AILLOUD PIERRE [FR], et al) [DX] 1-10 * claims 1-4 * * column 2, lines 57-59 ** column 1, lines 60,61 *; | [DX]US5962728 (MASON ROBERT W [US], et al) [DX] 1-10 * figure 1 * * column 5, line 48 - column 8, line 7 * * examples 1-11 * | Opposition | US2680127 | US3140305 | US3405040 | US3410888 | US3471543 | US3687422 | US4216063 | US5962728 | - RAOUZEOS et al., "ENVIRONMENTAL - Drying of Industrial Sludges and Distillation Residues with Total Solvents Recovery Using Kneader-Dryers", POLUTEX ASIA '98, (19980700), pages 1 - 10, XP055369044 | - TWITCHETT H.J., "Chemistry of the Production of Organic Isocyanates", CHEMICAL SOCIETY REVIEWS, (19740000), vol. 3, no. 2, pages 209 - 230, XP008045030 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/cs9740300209 |