EP1759920 - Device for the determination of the zero position of a tiltable vehicle's headlamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2008 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hella KGaA Hueck & Co. Rixbecker Strasse 75 59552 Lippstadt / DE | [2007/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Büttner, Karsten Südstrasse 67 59555 Lippstadt / DE | 02 /
Kirchner, Stefan Hermannstrasse 64 59555, Lippstadt / DE | 03 /
Plotzitzka, Jörg Varenseller Strasse 12 33397 Rietberg / DE | 04 /
Korff, Detlef Holunderweg 15 59555, Lippstadt / DE | [2007/10] | Application number, filing date | 06118324.0 | 02.08.2006 | [2007/10] | Priority number, date | DE20051041195 | 31.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005041195 | [2007/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1759920 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/076 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
B60Q1/076 (EP);
B60Q2200/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/46] |
Former [2007/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung der Nulllage einer schwenkbaren Scheinwerferanordnung eines Kraftfahrzeugs | [2007/10] | English: | Device for the determination of the zero position of a tiltable vehicle's headlamp | [2007/10] | French: | Dispositif pour la détermination de la position nominale d'un projecteur pivotant d'automobile | [2007/10] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/10] | 15.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1481846 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0010] - [0015] - [0017] - [0020] - [0022] - [0027] - [0031] , [0035] , [0045] - [0048] - [0052] , [0055]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 4; | [Y]WO2005036195 (POLYCONTACT AG [CH], et al) [Y] 4 * page 5, lines 6-14 *; | [A]DE10059677 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,5 * paragraphs [0003] , [0006] , [0007] , [0011] - [0013]; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | DE10241214 | DE102005008708 | DE102005021043 |