EP1752751 - A magnetometer and torque sensor assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive Systems, Inc. One Continental Drive Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | [2015/31] |
Former [2008/48] | For all designated states Continental Automotive Systems US, Inc. One Continental Drive Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | ||
Former [2007/07] | For all designated states Siemens VDO Automotive Corporation 2400 Executive Hills Drive Auburn Hills Michigan 48326-2980 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cripe, David Wayne 224 Manor Hill Drive Chatham, IL 62629 / US | [2016/28] |
Former [2007/07] | 01 /
Cripe, David Wayne 224 Manor Hill Drive Chatham, IL 62629 / US | Representative(s) | Bonn, Roman Klemens, et al Continental Automotive GmbH Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 22 16 39 80506 München / DE | [2016/28] |
Former [2013/08] | Bonn, Roman Klemens, et al Continental Automotive GmbH Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 22 16 39 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/44] | Fischer, Michael, et al Continental Automotive GmbH Patentabteilung Postfach 22 16 39 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/48] | Fischer, Michael, et al Continental Automotive GmbH Patentabteilung Lilienthalstrasse 15 85579 Neubiberg / DE | ||
Former [2007/07] | Payne, Janice Julia Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06118487.5 | 04.08.2006 | [2007/07] | Priority number, date | US20050707927P | 12.08.2005 Original published format: US 707927 P | US20060352749 | 13.02.2006 Original published format: US 352749 | [2007/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1752751 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1752751 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01L3/10 | [2007/07] | CPC: |
G01L3/102 (EP,US);
G01L3/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2016/28] |
Former [2007/42] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Magnetometer und Drehmomentsensoranordnung | [2007/07] | English: | A magnetometer and torque sensor assembly | [2007/07] | French: | Magnétomètre et assemblage de capteur de couple | [2007/07] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 24.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 04.01.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.09.2007 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2002162403 (CRIPE DAVID W [US]) [Y] 6,9,10,12-14,16,17 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] ** paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0056] *; | [XY]US2004007083 (VIOLA JEFFREY L [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,11,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0052] * [Y] 6,9,10,12-14,16,17 | by applicant | US2002162403 | US2004007083 |