EP1752228 - Process and device for detection and sorting of glass [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Binder & Co. Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 294 8200 Gleisdorf / AT | [2007/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pansinger, Christian Neupauerweg 83 8052 Graz / AT | 02 /
Huber, Reinhold Belevederestr. 2 8280 Fürstenfeld / AT | [2007/07] | Representative(s) | Henhapel, Bernhard Kliment & Henhapel Singerstrasse 8 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/07] | Henhapel, Bernhard Kliment & Henhapel Singerstrasse 8 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 06118548.4 | 07.08.2006 | [2007/07] | Priority number, date | AT20050000539U | 08.08.2005 Original published format: AT 53905 U | [2007/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1752228 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1752228 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B07C5/34, B07C5/36, G01N21/33 | [2007/07] | CPC: |
B07C5/3416 (EP,US);
B07C5/366 (EP,US);
G01N21/33 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/07] | Extension states | RS | 14.08.2007 | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Detektion und Sortierung von Glas | [2007/07] | English: | Process and device for detection and sorting of glass | [2007/07] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de détection et de tri du verre | [2007/07] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 11.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.11.2010 | CZ | 24.11.2010 | EE | 24.11.2010 | FI | 24.11.2010 | HU | 24.11.2010 | IE | 24.11.2010 | LT | 24.11.2010 | LV | 24.11.2010 | RO | 24.11.2010 | SI | 24.11.2010 | SK | 24.11.2010 | TR | 24.11.2010 | BG | 24.02.2011 | GR | 25.02.2011 | IS | 24.03.2011 | PT | 24.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
TR | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 24.11.2010 | |
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 24.11.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4339822 (NOELL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 20 - line 38 *; | [A]EP0820819 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [A]WO2004063729 (SCHOTT GLAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 4, line 11 - page 5, line 17 * | by applicant | DE4339822 |