EP1886787 - Bonding and coating of layers of raw material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2011 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novem Car Interior Design GmbH Industriestrasse 45 95519 Vorbach / DE | [2008/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Manzoni, Antonio Via Roma 5 24060 Bagnatica / IT | 02 /
Kumpf, Karl-August Via Ronco 7/A 24060 Torre De Roveri / IT | 03 /
Egerer, Gerhard Proissach 39 92724 Trabitz / DE | [2008/07] | Representative(s) | Szynka, Dirk König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zielstattstraße 38 81379 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/07] | Szynka, Dirk König, Szynka, Tilmann, von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Sollner Strasse 9 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06118602.9 | 08.08.2006 | [2008/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1886787 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1886787 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/14, B29C70/78, // B29K311/14 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
B29C45/1671 (EP,US);
B29C45/14221 (EP,US);
B29C45/14811 (EP,US);
B29C2045/14188 (EP,US);
B29K2711/14 (EP,US);
B29K2715/006 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/07] | Title | German: | Verkleben und Beschichten von Rohstofflagen | [2008/07] | English: | Bonding and coating of layers of raw material | [2008/07] | French: | Collage et revêtement de couches de matière première | [2008/07] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2007 | Examination requested [2008/07] | 05.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08019913.6 / EP2027982 | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.12.2010 | CZ | 08.12.2010 | DK | 08.12.2010 | EE | 08.12.2010 | FI | 08.12.2010 | HU | 08.12.2010 | IE | 08.12.2010 | LT | 08.12.2010 | LV | 08.12.2010 | NL | 08.12.2010 | PL | 08.12.2010 | RO | 08.12.2010 | SI | 08.12.2010 | SK | 08.12.2010 | TR | 08.12.2010 | BG | 08.03.2011 | GR | 09.03.2011 | ES | 19.03.2011 | IS | 08.04.2011 | PT | 08.04.2011 | AT | 08.08.2011 | GB | 08.08.2011 | LU | 08.08.2011 | BE | 31.08.2011 | CH | 31.08.2011 | LI | 31.08.2011 | MC | 31.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
TR | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
AT | 08.08.2011 | ||
GB | 08.08.2011 | ||
LU | 08.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
AT | 08.08.2011 | ||
GB | 08.08.2011 | ||
LU | 08.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
AT | 08.08.2011 | ||
GB | 08.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
GB | 08.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 08.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0330921 (YAMAHA CORP) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [X]WO2004073951 (FAURECIA INNENRAUM SYS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7 * page 5, lines 6-21 * * claims 9,13,14 ** figure - *; | [X]US6887413 (SCHUMACHER ROLF [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,8,10 * column 2, lines 14-24 * * column 3, lines 1-7 * * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 5 * * claims 2,3 *; | [X]EP1676688 (KASAI KOGYO KK [JP]) [X] 1-4,6 * paragraphs [0058] - [0060] - [0078] , [0079] * * claims 7,8 * * figures 4-7 * |