EP1763162 - Method of upgrading software through download in T-DMB terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Hyun-Chul c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Young-Jip c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Lee, Byoung-Dai, c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Shim, Chang-Sup, c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Oh, Yun-Je, c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2007/11] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06119073.2 | 17.08.2006 | [2007/11] | Priority number, date | KR20050075299 | 17.08.2005 Original published format: KR 20050075299 | [2007/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1763162 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1763162 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04H1/00 | [2007/11] | CPC: |
H04H20/91 (EP,US);
H04H60/25 (EP,US);
H04H2201/11 (EP,US);
H04H2201/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2012/03] |
Former [2007/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Aktualisierung von Software durch Fernladung im T-DMB Terminal | [2011/19] | English: | Method of upgrading software through download in T-DMB terminal | [2007/11] | French: | Méthode de mise à jour du logiciel par téléchargement dans un terminal T-DMB | [2007/11] |
Former [2007/11] | Verfahren für Aktualisierung von Software durch Fernladung im T-DMB Terminal | Examination procedure | 17.08.2006 | Examination requested [2007/11] | 10.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/35] | 13.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.12.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005048604 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-24 * figures 2,4,5,6,7 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0026] , [0027] , [0028] , [0036] *; | [A] - "Radio Broadcasting Systems; Digital Audio Broadcasting (DAB) to mobile, portable and fixed receivers; ETSI EN 300 401", ETSI STANDARDS, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20010501), vol. BC, no. V1.3.3, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014001360 [A] 1,3,4,6-9,11,12,15,16,18-21,23,24 * figures 12,14 * * tables 1, 3, 29 * * page 29 - page 32 * * page 42 - page 42 * * page 104 - page 105 * | Examination | WO2005043911 | by applicant | WO2005043911 | WO2005048604 |