EP1759992 - Aircraft cabin pressure control system and method for reducing outflow valve actuator induced cabin pressure oscillations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | ||
Former [2007/10] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCoy, Gerard L. 6353 North Camino Padre Isidoro Tucson, AZ 85718 / US | [2007/10] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06119729.9 | 29.08.2006 | [2007/10] | Priority number, date | US20050215847 | 30.08.2005 Original published format: US 215847 | [2007/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1759992 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1759992 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B64D13/04 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
G05B5/01 (EP,US);
B64D13/04 (EP,US);
Y02T50/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/40] |
Former [2007/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kabinendruckregelsystem und Verfahren zum Reduzieren von durch Luftaustrittsventilaktuator induzierten Druckpulsationen | [2007/10] | English: | Aircraft cabin pressure control system and method for reducing outflow valve actuator induced cabin pressure oscillations | [2007/10] | French: | Système régulateur de pression d'une cabine d'aéronef et procédé pour réduire les oscillations de pression induites par l'actionneur de la vanne de régulation d'échappement d'air | [2007/10] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/07] | 01.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5186681 (EMMONS FLOYD R [US]) [A] 1,7 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 15 *; | [A]US5297987 (EMMONS F RICHARD [US], et al) |