EP1900378 - Pharmaceutical compositions for the treatment of fungal infections [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mayer, Friederich Karl Im Ziegelgarten 9 4104, Oberwil / CH | [2008/12] | Representative(s) | Vallet, Lucien, et al Novartis AG Geistiges Eigentum Konzern Patent- und Markenabteilung CH Postfach CH-4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | Vallet, Lucien, et al Novartis AG Geistiges Eigentum Konzern Patent- und Markenabteilung CH Postfach CH-4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 06119884.2 | 31.08.2006 | [2008/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1900378 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/06, A61K31/69, A61K31/137, A61P31/10 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
A61K31/69 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/135 (KR);
A61K31/137 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/137, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/69, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/48] |
Former [2008/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen zur Behandlung von Pilzinfektionen | [2008/12] | English: | Pharmaceutical compositions for the treatment of fungal infections | [2008/12] | French: | Compositions pharmaceutiques pour le traitment d'infections fongiques | [2008/12] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/13] | 04.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9533754 (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 1, lines 1-4,35-40 * * page 5, lines 33-37 * * page 6, lines 5-10 * * page 7, lines 27-34 * * page 10, lines 16-19 * * page 11, lines 5-16 * * Ex. 64 on pages 22-23;; example 1 *; | [Y]WO2005013892 (ANACOR PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * page 5, line 10 - page 7, line 22 * * page 19, line 16 - page 20, line END * * page 26, line 21 - page 31, line 14 * * examples 11-39 *; | [A]WO2005021483 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-7* page 1 *; | [Y]WO2006089067 (ANACOR PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraphs [0002] , [0018] , [0001] - [0030] - [0071] - [0078] - [0103] , [0110] - [0116] - [0135] , [0144] - [0147] - [0256] , [0257]; examples 16-20 *; | [Y] - BAKER STEPHEN J ET AL, "Discovery of a new boron-containing antifungal agent, 5-fluoro-1,3-dihydro-1-hydroxy-2,1-benzoxaborole (AN2690), for the potential treatment of onychomycosis", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (200607), vol. 49, no. 15, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 4447 - 4450, XP002416532 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm0603724 |