EP1763051 - Plasma display panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575, Shin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575, Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yim, Sang-Hoon c/o Samsung SDI Co., LTD. 428-5 Gongse-ri Giheung Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Yoon Chang c/o Samsung SDI Co., LTD. 428-5 Gongse-ri Giheung Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Lee, Min Suk c/o Samsung SDI Co., LTD. 428-5 Gongse-ri Giheung Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Park, Hyoung Bin c/o Samsung SDI Co., LTD. 428-5 Gongse-ri Giheung Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2007/11] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06119912.1 | 31.08.2006 | [2007/11] | Priority number, date | KR20050083108 | 07.09.2005 Original published format: KR 20050083108 | [2007/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1763051 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1763051 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01J17/04 | [2007/11] | CPC: |
H01J11/22 (EP,US);
H01J11/46 (KR);
H01J11/12 (EP,US);
H01J11/16 (EP,US);
H01J11/38 (KR);
H01J11/42 (KR);
H01J61/0672 (EP,US);
H01J61/305 (EP,US);
H01J61/70 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/47] |
Former [2007/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Plasma-Bildschirm | [2007/11] | English: | Plasma display panel | [2007/11] | French: | Ecran plasma | [2007/11] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2006 | Examination requested [2007/11] | 12.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2265172 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-4 * figure 1 * * page 6, line 3 - line 12 * * page 5, line 34 - line 35 * * claim 5 * * page 8, line 1 - line 11 *; | [Y]JPH02132731 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [Y] 8 * abstract *; | [X]US6069446 (KIM JAE GAK [KR]) [X] 1 * column 5, line 38 - line 46 * * figure 8 * * claim 1 *; | [Y]JP2002156940 (KENWOOD CORP) [Y] 3 * abstract * * figure 3 *; | [XY]US2003230983 (VONALLMEN PAUL A [US]) [X] 1,6 * figure 2 * * claim 11 * * paragraph [0002] * [Y] 3,5,8; | [Y]US2005127838 (AMANO YOSHIFUMI [JP]) [Y] 5 * paragraphs [0075] , [0078] *; | [Y]JP2005174684 (OKAYA ELECTRIC INDUSTRY CO) [Y] 8* abstract * |