EP1894983 - Granules for use in abrading or cutting tools production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sheridan, Cedric 3 Route de Luxembourg 7423 Dondelange / LU | [2008/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | Beissel, Jean, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. 234, route d'Arlon B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | Beissel, Jean, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A., 234, route d'Arlon, B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | Application number, filing date | 06119978.2 | 01.09.2006 | [2008/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1894983 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/14, B24D3/00 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
B24D11/00 (EP);
B24D18/00 (EP);
B24D3/34 (EP);
C09K3/1427 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/46] |
Former [2008/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Granulate zur Herstellung von Schleif- oder Schneidewerkzeugen | [2008/10] | English: | Granules for use in abrading or cutting tools production | [2008/10] | French: | Granules pour l'utilisation dans les productions des outils abrasifs ou coupants | [2008/10] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/12] | 16.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4770907 (KIMURA KOICHI [JP]) [X] 1* claims 1--18 *; | [X]EP0533443 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,4,6-10 * column 3, line 30 - column 5, line 13; claims 1-8 *; | [X]WO2004053013 (TREIBACHER SCHLEIFMITTEL GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,9,10 * page 4, lines 6-31; claims 1-14 * |