EP1785794 - Display of preconditions during the input of operational commands [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marek, Frank Winzerstrasse 42 76669, Bad Schönborn / DE | [2007/20] | Application number, filing date | 06120096.0 | 05.09.2006 | [2007/20] | Priority number, date | DE20051046686 | 29.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005046686 | [2007/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1785794 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1785794 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/409, B41F33/00 | [2007/20] | CPC: |
G05B19/409 (EP);
B41F33/0009 (EP);
B41F33/0018 (EP);
G05B2219/2646 (EP);
G05B2219/35283 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/20] | Title | German: | Anzeige von Vorbedingungen bei der Eingabe von Bedienbefehlen | [2007/20] | English: | Display of preconditions during the input of operational commands | [2007/20] | French: | Affichage des conditions lors de la saisie préalables de commandes d'opération | [2007/20] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 23.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 18.01.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.06.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/30] | Appeal following examination | 09.03.2012 | Appeal received No. T1404/12 | 11.05.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.06.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.09.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0990519 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [X] 1-4,10-16 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0008] - [0010] - [0012] , [0020] , [0022] , [0023] , [0030] , [0034] , [0035] , [0038]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 5-9; | [XY]DE19715101 (SAECHSISCHES INST FUER DIE DRU [DE]) [X] 1 * column 1, lines 3-11,28-41 * * column 3, lines 15-43 * [Y] 6; | [Y]DE10117713 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0005] , [0007] , [0008] , [0010] , [0011] , [0013] - [0015] - [0017] , [0018] , [0020] , [0022]; claims 2-7 *; | [Y]AT5752U (ENGEL GMBH MASCHBAU [AT]) [Y] 1-4,10-15 * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraphs 1,2 * * page 4, paragraph 3 * * page 6, paragraph 4 * * page 7, paragraphs 3,4 * * page 8, paragraphs 1-3 *; | [DA]DE102004033056 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [DA] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3220622 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0990519 |