EP1760925 - Method and system for providing feedback information in a radio communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS S.P.A. St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/10] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Döttling, Martin Hauptstr. 56 85579 Neubiberg / DE | 02 /
Hindelang, Thomas Hubertusstr. 50 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE | 03 /
Lobinger, Andreas Kolpingstr. 6 83714 Miesbach / DE | 04 /
Michel, Jürgen Sebastian-Bauer-Str. 35 81737 München / DE | 05 /
Raaf, Bernhard Knollerweg 14 82061 Neuried / DE | 06 /
Viering, Ingo Sintpertstr. 11 81539 München / DE | [2007/10] | Application number, filing date | 06120115.8 | 05.09.2006 | [2007/10] | Priority number, date | EP20050019244 | 05.09.2005 Original published format: EP 05019244 | [2007/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1760925 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1760925 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04B7/005 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
H04L1/0026 (EP);
H04W52/262 (EP);
H04L1/0003 (EP);
H04L1/0009 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/10] | H04L1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Erzeugung einer Rückführungsinformation in einem Funkkommunikationssystem | [2007/10] | English: | Method and system for providing feedback information in a radio communication system | [2007/10] | French: | Méthode et système pour fournir une information de retour dans un système de communication radio | [2007/10] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 08.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/02] | 25.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1339175 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * column 1, paragraph 4 * * column 2, paragraph 13 - column 3, paragraph 14; figure 11 * * figure 2 *; | [X]US2003092461 (MOULSLEY TIMOTHY J [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * page 2, paragraph 17 - paragraph 19 *; | [X]US2003123598 (GOLLAMUDI SRIDHAR [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6 * page 1, paragraph 5 *; | [X]US2004142698 (PIETRASKI PHILIP J [US]) [X] 1,3,5,6 * page 1, paragraph 5 - paragraph 6 *; | [X]WO2005078976 (WALTICAL SOLUTIONS INC FORMERL [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6 * page 5, paragraph 27 - page 6 * |