EP1768018 - System and method for compiling images for printing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | [2007/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pangrazio, Donald M / 85 East Main Street Leroy, NY 14482 / US | 02 /
Leone III, Anthony J / 18 East Park Road Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | 03 /
Cecchi, Ann M / 635 Chatelaine Drive Webster, NY 14580 / US | 04 /
Loj, Katherine / 52 Worthington Road Rochester, NY 14622 / US | 05 /
Evan, Michael J / 82 Anytrell Drive Webster, NY 14580 / US | [2015/18] |
Former [2007/13] | 01 /
Pangrazio, Donald M 85 East Main Street Leroy, NY 14482 / US | ||
02 /
Leone III, Anthony J 18 East Park Road Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | |||
03 /
Cecchi, Ann M 635 Chatelaine Drive Webster, NY 14580 / US | |||
04 /
Loj, Katherine 52 Worthington Road Rochester, NY 14622 / US | |||
05 /
Evan, Michael J 82 Anytrell Drive Webster, NY 14580 / US | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/18] | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | ||
Former [2007/13] | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06120123.2 | 05.09.2006 | [2007/13] | Priority number, date | US20050222061 | 08.09.2005 Original published format: US 222061 | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1768018 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1768018 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | [2008/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1768018 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12, G06F17/20 | [2008/19] | CPC: |
G06F3/1244 (EP,US);
G06F3/1204 (EP,US);
G06F3/1284 (EP,US);
G06F3/1285 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/13] | G06F3/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2015/18] |
Former [2009/03] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Zusammenstellung von Druckbildern | [2007/13] | English: | System and method for compiling images for printing | [2007/13] | French: | Système et procédé de compilation d'images pour impression | [2007/13] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 08.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 07.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6078934 (LAHEY CORNING L [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 5, lines 49-62 ** figures 7,8 *; | [X]EP1398688 (RICOH KK [JP]) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0017] - [0030] * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0034] - [0037] * * figure 3 * * paragraph [0104] * * figure 13 *; | [X]US2004141207 (WARMUS JAMES L [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0061] , [0062] * * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0064] , [0065] * * figure 3 * * paragraph [0068] * * figure 4 * * paragraphs [0069] - [0080] * * figure 5 * | by applicant | US2004141207 |