EP1769937 - Stapling device with a vertically adjustable stapling head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/14] | Stapling device with vertically adjustable head | ||
[2011/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Intellectual Property Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brünner, Torsten Zum Grünen Winkel 27 04451 Borsdorf / DE | 02 /
Tischer, Siegmar Am Mittelgraben 9 04451 Borsdorf / DE | [2007/14] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/26] | Application number, filing date | 06120166.1 | 06.09.2006 | [2007/14] | Priority number, date | DE20051046683 | 29.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005046683 | [2007/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1769937 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1769937 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B42B4/00, B42C1/12 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
B42B4/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/14] | Title | German: | Heftvorrichtung mit vertikal verschiebbarem Heftkopf | [2007/14] | English: | Stapling device with a vertically adjustable stapling head | [2011/44] | French: | Agrafeuse pourvue d'une tête d'agrafage réglable en hauteur | [2011/44] |
Former [2007/14] | Stapling device with vertically adjustable head | ||
Former [2007/14] | Agrafeuse avec tête réglable en hauteur | Examination procedure | 04.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 06.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.09.2006 | CY | 27.06.2012 | CZ | 27.06.2012 | DK | 27.06.2012 | EE | 27.06.2012 | FI | 27.06.2012 | IT | 27.06.2012 | LT | 27.06.2012 | LV | 27.06.2012 | NL | 27.06.2012 | PL | 27.06.2012 | RO | 27.06.2012 | SE | 27.06.2012 | SI | 27.06.2012 | SK | 27.06.2012 | TR | 27.06.2012 | AT | 06.09.2012 | IE | 06.09.2012 | LU | 06.09.2012 | BG | 27.09.2012 | GB | 27.09.2012 | GR | 28.09.2012 | BE | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | FR | 01.10.2012 | ES | 08.10.2012 | IS | 27.10.2012 | PT | 29.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
TR | 27.06.2012 | ||
AT | 06.09.2012 | ||
IE | 06.09.2012 | ||
LU | 06.09.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GB | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
TR | 27.06.2012 | ||
AT | 06.09.2012 | ||
IE | 06.09.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GB | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
AT | 06.09.2012 | ||
IE | 06.09.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GB | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
IE | 06.09.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GB | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
IE | 06.09.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GB | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
IE | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | EE | 27.06.2012 | |
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 27.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3708160 (STAUB D, et al) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 4 - line 20 * * column 12, line 48 - line 50 * * column 13, line 61 - column 14, line 6 * * column 14, line 20 - line 24 * * column 19, line 31 - line 42 * * figures 1,17,19; claims 1-3,10 * [Y] 3-9; | [Y]US3899165 (ABRAM STEWART J, et al) [Y] 3-9 * column 1, line 4 - line 14 * * column 3, line 60 - line 63 * * column 6, line 57 - line 63 * * column 10, line 38 - line 67 * * figure 5; claims 1-4,26,29 *; | [Y]US4537342 (MCCAIN WILLIAM B [US], et al) [Y] 3-5,8 * column 1, line 48 - line 63 * * column 3, line 35 - line 49 * * column 4, line 19 - line 26 * * column 4, line 39 - line 61 * * figures 2,3; claims 1,2,4 *; | [A]GB388917 (BREHMER GEB) [A] 1-9 * page 3, line 117 - line 129 * * page 4, line 15 - line 27 * * figures 11,13,15; claims 1,10,11,13 * |