EP1767751 - Cylinder lubricating device for an engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wärtsilä Schweiz AG Zürcherstrasse 12 8401 Winterthur / CH | [2007/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aschwanden, Stefan Poststrasse 22 8332 Russikon / CH | 02 /
Schmid, Daniel Im oberen Gern 77 8409 Winterthur / CH | 03 /
Stiefenhofer, Priska Bahnhofstrasse 20 8304 Wallisellen / CH | 04 /
Wijeyratne, Norman Hardackerstrasse 24 8302 Kloten / CH | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | Sulzer Management AG Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 14 8401 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Sulzer Management AG Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 12 8401 Winterthur / CH | ||
Former [2007/13] | Sulzer Management AG Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 12 8401 Winterthur / CH | Application number, filing date | 06120296.6 | 07.09.2006 | [2007/13] | Priority number, date | EP20050405555 | 23.09.2005 Original published format: EP 05405555 | [2007/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1767751 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1767751 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F01M1/02, F01M1/08, F01M1/14, F01M1/16, F01M9/00 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
F01M1/16 (EP,KR);
F01M1/06 (KR);
F01M1/02 (EP);
F01M1/08 (EP);
F01M1/14 (EP);
F01M9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Title | German: | Zylinderschmiersystem für eine Hubkolbenbrennkraftmaschine | [2007/13] | English: | Cylinder lubricating device for an engine | [2007/13] | French: | Dispositif de lubrification de cylindre d'un moteur à conbustion interne | [2007/13] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 11.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.07.2008 | CZ | 30.07.2008 | EE | 30.07.2008 | IE | 30.07.2008 | LT | 30.07.2008 | LV | 30.07.2008 | NL | 30.07.2008 | RO | 30.07.2008 | SI | 30.07.2008 | SK | 30.07.2008 | TR | 30.07.2008 | AT | 07.09.2008 | LU | 07.09.2008 | BE | 30.09.2008 | FR | 30.09.2008 | MC | 30.09.2008 | BG | 30.10.2008 | SE | 30.10.2008 | GR | 31.10.2008 | ES | 10.11.2008 | IS | 30.11.2008 | PT | 30.12.2008 | HU | 31.01.2009 | [2011/03] |
Former [2010/41] | CY | 30.07.2008 | |
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
IE | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
TR | 30.07.2008 | ||
AT | 07.09.2008 | ||
LU | 07.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
FR | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
HU | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CZ | 30.07.2008 | |
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
IE | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
AT | 07.09.2008 | ||
LU | 07.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
FR | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/13] | CZ | 30.07.2008 | |
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
IE | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
AT | 07.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
FR | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/02] | CZ | 30.07.2008 | |
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
IE | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
AT | 07.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
FR | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/32] | CZ | 30.07.2008 | |
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
IE | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | CZ | 30.07.2008 | |
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
IE | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | LT | 30.07.2008 | |
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | LT | 30.07.2008 | |
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | LT | 30.07.2008 | |
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 30.07.2008 | |
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0267410 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [A] 1,7,8* the whole document *; | [A]DE19743955 (MAN B & W DIESEL GMBH [DK]) [A] 1,7,8 * column 6, line 56 - column 7, line 44; figure - *; | [A]DE10220015 (MAN B & W DIESEL AS KOPENHAGEN [DK]) [A] 1,7,8 * paragraphs [0009] - [0019]; figure - *; | [A]EP1426571 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7,8 * paragraph [0013]; figure - * |