EP1764467 - Box exit, especially for the support of a drive crank of a roller shutter and drive device with such a box exit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deprat Jean SA 24 Rue de la Papinerie ZI Roubaix Est 59115 Leers / FR | [2009/48] |
Former [2008/07] | For all designated states Deprat Jean SA Parc des Moulins 6 Avenue de la Créativité BP 10484 59650 Villeneuve d'Ascq / FR | ||
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states Deprat Jean SA 13 Bis Rue Roger Salengro 59115 Leers / FR | ||
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states DEPRAT Jean S.A. 13 Bis, rue Roger Salengro 59115 Leers / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Couturier, Régis 9, rue des Mimosas 59115 Leers / FR | 02 /
Doyennette, Ludovic 21 rue Léon Blum 59239, Thumeries / FR | 03 /
Castell, Mathias 74 rue Edouard Lalo 59320 Hallennes lez Haubourdin / FR | [2007/12] | Representative(s) | Balesta, Pierre, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie Immeuble Eurocentre 179 Boulevard de Turin 59777 Lille / FR | [2012/17] |
Former [2009/45] | Hennion, Jean-Claude, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie Agence de Lille Immeuble Eurocentre (Euralille) 179, boulevard de Turin 59777 Lille / FR | ||
Former [2007/12] | Hennion, Jean-Claude, et al Cabinet Beau de Lomenie, 27bis rue du Vieux Faubourg 59000 Lille / FR | Application number, filing date | 06120552.2 | 13.09.2006 | [2007/12] | Priority number, date | FR20050009592 | 20.09.2005 Original published format: FR 0509592 | [2007/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1764467 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1764467 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1764467 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E05D15/00, // E06B9/17 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
E05F9/00 (EP);
E05Y2900/146 (EP);
E06B9/17007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR [2013/30] |
Former [2007/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kastenausgang, insbesondere zur Unterstützung einer Antriebskurbel eines Rollladens und eine mit einem derartigen Kastenausgang versehene Antriebsvorrichtung | [2013/23] | English: | Box exit, especially for the support of a drive crank of a roller shutter and drive device with such a box exit | [2007/12] | French: | Dispositif de sortie de caisson, notamment destiné au maintien d'une manivelle de manoeuvre d'un volet roulant et organe de commande équipé d'un tel dispositif de sortie de caisson | [2007/12] |
Former [2007/12] | Kastenausgang, insbesondere zur Unterstützung einer Antriebskurbel eines Rollladens und einer mit einem derartigen Kastenausgang versehenen Antriebsvorrichtung | Examination procedure | 02.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/20] | 27.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2730002 (SIMU [FR]) [A] 1-12 * page 2, line 23 - line 37; figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP0723065 (DEPRAT JEAN SA [FR]) [A] 12 * column 4, line 41 - line 56; figure 5 * * column 5, line 20 - line 28 *; | [A]EP0686780 (SYSTEMES BLG [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |