EP1775393 - Protective structure for a cabin of a workmachine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kobelco Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 12-4, Gion 3-chome, Asaminami-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-0138 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states KOBELCO CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 12-4, Gion 3-chome, Asaminami-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 731-0138 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murakami, Masaaki Kobelco Constr. Mach. Co., Ltd. 12-4, Gion 3-chome, Asaminami-ku Hiroshima Hiroshima 731-0138 / JP | [2007/16] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06120642.1 | 14.09.2006 | [2007/16] | Priority number, date | JP20050299742 | 14.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005299742 | [2007/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1775393 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/16, B60R21/13, E02F9/18 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
E02F9/163 (EP,US);
B60R21/131 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/16] | Title | German: | Bügelstruktur zum Schutz der Kabine einer Arbeitsmaschine | [2007/16] | English: | Protective structure for a cabin of a workmachine | [2007/16] | French: | Structure de protection pour cabine d'engins de travaux publics | [2007/16] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 30.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH08142785 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [AD] 1-5,8 * figures 1,20 *; | [A]JPH08218436 (SUMITOMO CONSTR MACH) [A] 1-5,8 * figure 3a *; | [A]JP2003232053 (SUMITOMO CONSTR MACHINERY MFG) [A] 1-5,8 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2005044642 (VOLVO CONSTR EQUIP HOLDING SE [SE], et al) [A] 1-5,8 * figures 3,7 *; | [AP]JP2005350948 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [AP] 1-5,8* figures 2,4 * |