EP1900631 - Marine propulsion and constructional details thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yellowfin Limited 2 Saxon House, Saxon Wharf, Lower York Street Southampton Hampshire SO14 4QF / GB | [2008/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duncan, Ian 54 Spitfire Way Hamble Southampton Hampshire SO13 4RT / GB | 02 /
Webb, Robert 10 Shelley Road Thornhill Southampton Hampshire SO19 6QJ / GB | [2008/12] | Representative(s) | Smee, Anthony James Michael Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | Smee, Anthony James Michael Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06120797.3 | 15.09.2006 | [2008/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1900631 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B63H1/22, B63H3/04, B64C11/28, B64C11/30 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
B63H3/04 (EP);
B63H1/22 (EP);
B64C11/06 (EP);
B64C11/32 (EP);
B64C27/39 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/48] |
Former [2008/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schiffsantrieb und dessen Konstruktionseinzelheiten | [2008/12] | English: | Marine propulsion and constructional details thereof | [2008/12] | French: | Propulseur marin et ses détails constructifs | [2008/12] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/12] | 28.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2006007625 (AIMBRIDGE PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1 * page 9, line 31 - page 25, line 28; figures 8-14 * [Y] 2,3,6-14; | [XY]WO9965766 (SECORD DENVER D [CA]) [X] 4,5 * page 17, line 24 - page 18, line 28; figures 1,2,4,14,15 * [Y] 2,3,6-14; | [X]JPS59227592 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]US4565531 (KIMON PETER M [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 4; figure 1 *; | [X]US4964822 (MUELLER PETER [CH]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1008514 (BUECHLER DIRK [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * |