EP1764539 - Duct passing through a firewall [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | [2008/38] |
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Williams, Nicholas A 844 East Windsow Avenue Phoenix, AZ 85006 / US | [2007/12] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06120849.2 | 18.09.2006 | [2007/12] | Priority number, date | US20050230755 | 19.09.2005 Original published format: US 230755 | [2007/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1764539 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1764539 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16L5/04 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
F16L5/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/35] |
Former [2007/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rohrdurchführung durch eine Feuersperre | [2007/12] | English: | Duct passing through a firewall | [2007/12] | French: | Conduite traversant l'ouverture d'une barrière coupe-feu | [2007/12] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/52] | 01.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0506497 (ROBERTSON ERIC B [US], et al) [A] 1,2,9 * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 20; figure 6 *; | [A]US4894966 (BAILEY PAUL R [CA], et al) [A] 1,2,9 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 48 *; | [A]FR2363673 (PONT A MOUSSON [FR]) [A] 1,2,9 * page 3, line 33 - page 4, line 28; figure 1 *; | [A]FR1502749 (AMISOL MANUFACTURE D AMIANTE &, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1180629 (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1,4 * |